This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2016 at 23:40:08 (UTC).

United States of America v. Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 United States of America filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Murray Transfer Storage Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc

Charles Dwayne Cauley

Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc.

Terminal Storage Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal Fowler

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

310 New Bern Avenue, Suite 800, Federal Building

Raleigh, NC 27601-1461

Defendant Attorney

R. Daniel Boyce

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

4141 Parklake Ave., Suite 200, P. O. Box 30188

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

1 #16

Proposed Summons Terminal Storage Company, Inc.

1 #15

Proposed Summons Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc.

1 #14

Proposed Summons Charles Dewayne Cauley

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit J - Cauley 2012 Contract (signed)

1 #10

Exhibit I - Murray 2012 Contract M67001-12-D-0003

1 #2

Exhibit A - Terminal 2006 Contract M67001-06-D-0006

1 #1

Index

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 05/23/2016)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Solicitation/Contract/Order dated March 23, 2011) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/13/2016)

#10

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Brian Baker v. Bank of America, 2013 WL 6408221, #2 Attachment: Paul Yongo v. Nationwide Affinity Insurance, 2008 WL 516744) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/07/2016)

#13

(#13) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/8/2016. (Jenkins, C.) (Entered: 07/08/2016)

14 #1

Exhibit E - Solicitation/Contract/Order dated March 23, 2011

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Solicitation/Contract/Order dated March 23, 2011) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/13/2016)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Dismiss filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 07/27/2016)

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 08/10/2016)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 08/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 08/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting defendants' motion for extension of time #15 . Defendants shall have through and including August 10, 2016 to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/27/2016. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 07/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court regarding: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Dismiss. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 07/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Dismiss filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 07/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Solicitation/Contract/Order dated March 23, 2011) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/8/2016. (Jenkins, C.) (Entered: 07/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss & Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (Jenkins, C.) (Entered: 07/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Brian Baker v. Bank of America, 2013 WL 6408221, #2 Attachment: Paul Yongo v. Nationwide Affinity Insurance, 2008 WL 516744) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by United States of America. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 07/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 06/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 5/24/2016. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 05/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 05/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting defendants' #5 motion for extension of time. Defendants Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc. and Terminal Storage Co., Inc. have through and including May 23, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Jolie Skinner for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 4/21/2016. (Skinner, J.) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court regarding: #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by R. Daniel Boyce on behalf of All Defendants. (Boyce, R.) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Charles Dwayne Cauley, Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., Terminal Storage Co., Inc. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of United States of America. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Terminal 2006 Contract M67001-06-D-0006, #3 Exhibit B - Facsimile dated March 8, 2006, #4 Exhibit C - Email dated May 10, 2010, #5 Exhibit D - Terminal 2011 Contract Solicitation, #6 Exhibit E - Terminal 2011 Contract Order, #7 Exhibit F - Terminal April 2011 Invoices, #8 Exhibit G - 2012 Contract, #9 Exhibit H - Email and 2012 Contract, #10 Exhibit I - Murray 2012 Contract M67001-12-D-0003, #11 Exhibit J - Cauley 2012 Contract (signed), #12 Exhibit K - April 2012 Invoices, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons Charles Dewayne Cauley, #15 Proposed Summons Murray Transfer & Storage Company, Inc., #16 Proposed Summons Terminal Storage Company, Inc.) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less