This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:42:57 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Moyer

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Moyer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Lawrence E. Kahn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MC-00018

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Lawrence E. Kahn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Respondent

Frank J. Moyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas Spina, Jr.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Albany

445 Broadway, Room 218

Albany, NY 12207-2924

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Unexecuted as to USA on 7/26/2018 as to the Court Order. (meb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#5

(#5) LETTER REQUEST & ORDER re Letter Motion #4 from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing be rescheduled for September 20, 2018. Request is GRANTED. Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Motion Hearing is reset for 9/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 31, 2018. (sas) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#4

(#4) Letter Motion from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 1, 2018, be rescheduled for September 20, 2018 submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Spina, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That the above-named respondent appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, at the James T. Foley U.S. Courthouse, 445 Broadway, Albany, New York on 8/1/2018 at 9:30 a.m. to show cause why the respondent should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service Summonses served upon the respondent on October 6, 2017, by Revenue Officer Alan Tabakman. That a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, be served upon the respondent by the United States Marshal, or in the alternative, by the District Director of the Internal revenue Service or his authorized employee, on or before 7/24/2018. That the respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before 7/30/2018. That any and all subsequent pleadings or papers filed herein by petitioner (not including any arrest order) may be served upon the respondent/taxpayer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 7/20/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Unexecuted as to USA on 7/26/2018 as to the Court Order. (meb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER REQUEST & ORDER re Letter Motion #4 from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing be rescheduled for September 20, 2018. Request is GRANTED. Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Motion Hearing is reset for 9/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 31, 2018. (sas) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter Motion from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 1, 2018, be rescheduled for September 20, 2018 submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Spina, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That the above-named respondent appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, at the James T. Foley U.S. Courthouse, 445 Broadway, Albany, New York on 8/1/2018 at 9:30 a.m. to show cause why the respondent should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service Summonses served upon the respondent on October 6, 2017, by Revenue Officer Alan Tabakman. That a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, be served upon the respondent by the United States Marshal, or in the alternative, by the District Director of the Internal revenue Service or his authorized employee, on or before 7/24/2018. That the respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before 7/30/2018. That any and all subsequent pleadings or papers filed herein by petitioner (not including any arrest order) may be served upon the respondent/taxpayer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 7/20/2018. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less