This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:00:38 (UTC).

United States of America v. Media Rights Technologies, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Media Rights Technologies, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05293

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Hank Risan

Media Rights Technologies, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Moore

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 11Th Floor, Box 36055

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Hank Risan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Media Rights Technologies, Inc.,. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Media Rights Technologies, Inc. Hank Risan. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) Modified on 8/30/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Hank Risan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Media Rights Technologies, Inc.,. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Media Rights Technologies, Inc. Hank Risan. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2018) Modified on 8/30/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.