This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2018 at 08:14:40 (UTC).

United States of America v. McKim-Freeman et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against McKim-Freeman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roger W Titus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02532

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger W Titus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Keith C. Freeman

Ann A. McKim-Freeman

Bank of America, NA

AG Investments, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew B Miller

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division

P.O. Box 227

Washington, DC 20044

Kavitha Bondada

Attorney at US Department of Justice

Po Box 227, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Summons

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) Summons Issued 21 days as to AG Investments, LLC, Bank of America, NA, Keith C. Freeman and Ann A. McKim-Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

9 #1

Redline Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AG Investments, LLC, Bank of America, NA, Keith C. Freeman and Ann A. McKim-Freeman, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Redline Amended Complaint)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/10/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

6 #10

Text of Proposed Order

6 #7

Proposed Summons for Ann McKim Freeman

6 #6

Proposed Summons for AG Investments

6 #5

Exhibit B - Deed

6 #3

Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint (redline)

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint (clean)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint (clean), #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint (redline), #4 Exhibit A - Deed, #5 Exhibit B - Deed, #6 Proposed Summons for AG Investments, #7 Proposed Summons for Ann McKim Freeman, #8 Proposed Summons for Bank of America, #9 Proposed Summons for Keith Freeman, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Keith Freeman, Ann A. McKim-Freeman, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued 21 days as to AG Investments, LLC, Bank of America, NA, Keith C. Freeman and Ann A. McKim-Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AG Investments, LLC, Bank of America, NA, Keith C. Freeman and Ann A. McKim-Freeman, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Redline Amended Complaint)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/10/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw #4 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/10/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint (clean), #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint (redline), #4 Exhibit A - Deed, #5 Exhibit B - Deed, #6 Proposed Summons for AG Investments, #7 Proposed Summons for Ann McKim Freeman, #8 Proposed Summons for Bank of America, #9 Proposed Summons for Keith Freeman, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Withdraw #4 Amended Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (WITHDRAWN) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keith C. Freeman, Ann A. McKim-Freeman, AG Investments, LLC, Bank of America, NA, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed to Baltimore Property, #2 Exhibit B - Deed to Bowie Property, #3 Proposed Summons for Ann McKim-Freeman, #4 Proposed Summons for Keith Freeman, #5 Proposed Summons for AG Investments, #6 Proposed Summons for Bank of America)(Miller, Matthew) Modified on 10/11/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Keith C. Freeman and Ann A. McKim-Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge Roger W Titus. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Miller on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Keith Freeman, Ann A. McKim-Freeman, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.