This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2018 at 07:03:20 (UTC).

United States of America v. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee R. West and Charles Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lee R. West

Charles Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin R Hines

Attorney at US Dept of Justice Tax Div-7238-DC

P O Box 7238, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Shiny R Pappy

Attorney at Roderick H Polston PC

2424 Springer Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 10:45 AM in Room 1305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (jb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC.(Pappy, Shiny) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Shiny R Pappy on behalf of Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC (Pappy, Shiny) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC served on 9/13/2018. (Hines, Erin) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Lee R. West no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Lee R. West on 9/7/2018. (kb) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC. (ml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 10:45 AM in Room 1305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (jb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC.(Pappy, Shiny) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Shiny R Pappy on behalf of Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC (Pappy, Shiny) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC served on 9/13/2018. (Hines, Erin) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Lee R. West no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Lee R. West on 9/7/2018. (kb) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC. (ml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.