This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2019 at 07:54:23 (UTC).

United States of America v. Hansen

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 United States of America filed a Contract - Student Loan Collection lawsuit against Hansen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01946

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Student Loan Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Mark Hansen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen Louise Bickers

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1000 Sw Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Mark Hansen on November 8, 2018 by United States of America. Waiver of Service is due by 12/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#1

(#1) Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against Mark Hansen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mark Hansen waiver sent on 12/4/2018. Filed by United States of America. (dsg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mark Hansen waiver sent on 12/4/2018. Filed by United States of America. (dsg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Mark Hansen on November 8, 2018 by United States of America. Waiver of Service is due by 12/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against Mark Hansen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less