This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:59:59 (UTC).

United States of America v. Hampton

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Hampton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01955

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

United States of America

Respondent

Ronald V Hampton, Jr.

Portland, OR 97225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kathleen Louise Bickers

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1000 Sw Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Order to Show Cause - A Show Cause Hearing is set for 12/17/2018 at 03:30PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed on 11/13/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#2

(#2) Declaration of Heather Buss . Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Petition to Enforce IRS Summons #1 .) (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Petition to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed by United States of America against Ronald V Hampton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STRICKEN - AUSA WILL SERVE COPY OF ORDER - Clerk's Notice of Mailing regarding Order to Show Cause #5 to Ronald V. Hampton, Jr. on 11/13/2018. (mja) Modified on 11/13/2018 (mja). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order to Show Cause - A Show Cause Hearing is set for 12/17/2018 at 03:30PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed on 11/13/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Ronald V. Hampton regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (rs) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of Heather Buss . Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Petition to Enforce IRS Summons #1 .) (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed by United States of America against Ronald V Hampton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.