This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:32:44 (UTC).

United States of America v. Dunn (MAG2)

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 United States of America filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dunn MAG2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William Keith Watkins and Gray M. Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-MC-03837

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

Referral Judge

Gray M. Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Jefferson S. Dunn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerusha Tatiana Adams

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

131 Clayton Street

Montgomery, AL 36101

Louis V. Franklin, Sr.

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 197

Montgomery, AL 36101-0197

Steven H. Rosenbaum

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Rights Division

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Carla Crosby Ward

Attorney at US Atty Office - NDAL

1801 4Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35213

Judith C. Preston

Attorney at U S DOJ - Special Litigation / Civil Rights Division

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Jason R. Cheek

Attorney at U S Atty Office - NDAL

1801 Fourth Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Lee Willford, Jr.

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

P O Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36104

Mary-Coleman Mayberry Roberts

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

Po Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36130-1501

 

Court Documents

15 #12

Exhibit L

15 #9

Exhibit I

15 #8

Exhibit H

15 #7

Exhibit G

15 #6

Exhibit F

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) Response to Order re #14 Order, by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Willford, Gary) Modified on 11/15/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 11/14/2018, Dunn shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, if any exists, as to why the court should not issue an order directing him to comply with the CRIPA Subpoena No. 2017-01, as further set out in order; 2) The parties shall appear for oral argument and, if necessary, an evidentiary hearing regarding this matter on 12/11/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 4E. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/24/2018. (Furnished: Calendar & CB)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#1

Motions No Longer Referred to Chief U.S. District Judge Watkins: #1 MOTION (PETITION) to enforce US Department of Justice Subpoena. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Reply to response to order to show cause re #15 Response to #14 Order filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ward, Carla) Modified on 11/29/2018 to add the links to the #14 order and #15 response (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Dft's Response, and Plf shall file its reply on or before 11/29/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/16/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Commissioner Dunn's Response by United States of America. (Ward, Carla) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Response to Order re #14 Order, by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Willford, Gary) Modified on 11/15/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 11/14/2018, Dunn shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, if any exists, as to why the court should not issue an order directing him to comply with the CRIPA Subpoena No. 2017-01, as further set out in order; 2) The parties shall appear for oral argument and, if necessary, an evidentiary hearing regarding this matter on 12/11/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 4E. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/24/2018. (Furnished: Calendar & CB)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • (#13) Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/17/2018. No pdf attached to this entry. (Recording Time 10:00-10:05.) (cb, ) Modified on 10/17/2018 (cb, ). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: Pursuant to the discussion during today's telephone conference, any party seeking the disqualification of the undersigned Magistrate Judge based on his role as a mediator of discovery disputes arising in the litigation styled as Braggs, et al. v. Dunn, et al., 2:14-cv-601-MHT-GMB, shall file a motion for recusal no later than 10/22/2018; After that date, the court will take appropriate action on all motions then pending in this matter. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/17/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of United States of America (Cheek, Jason) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that this matter is set for a status conference by telephone on 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM; The parties are directed to call (877) 336-1831 no later than five minutes before the start of the call and enter access code 5328913; If the parties encounter technical problems connecting to the call, please contact chambers directly. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/15/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Furnished: Calendar & CB) (alm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Amended NOTICE by Jefferson S. Dunn (Willford, Gary) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Adams, Jerusha) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jefferson S. Dunn; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to United States of America; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to US Magistrate Judge Honorable Gray M. Borden for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/11/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred to Chief U.S. District Judge Watkins: #1 MOTION (PETITION) to enforce US Department of Justice Subpoena. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PURSUANT TO THE #2 NOTICE - ***Attorney Mary-Coleman Mayberry Roberts for Jefferson S. Dunn added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PURSUANT TO THE #2 NOTICE - ***Attorney Gary Lee Willford, Jr for Jefferson S. Dunn added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden as referral judge (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Jefferson S. Dunn (Willford, Gary) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION (PETITION) to enforce U.S. Department of Justice Subpoena by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 civil cover sheet)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less