This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:42:50 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Diers

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Diers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MC-00016

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Respondent

Kristen Diers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas Spina, Jr.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Albany

445 Broadway, Room 218

Albany, NY 12207-2924

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Kristen Diers by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/10/2018. (ptm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed on 7/24/2018. (jlb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent Kristen Diers appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York at the Alexander Pirnie Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse at 10 Broad Street in Utica, New York, on the 10th day of August, 2018 at 10 a.m., The United States Marshal, or in the alternative, the District Director of the Internal Revenue Service or his authorized employee, shall serve a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, upon respondent on or before July 24, 2018, Respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/17/2018. (jlb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Kristen Diers by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/10/2018. (ptm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David N. Hurd in Utica, NY. Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2018. Judge Hurd hears statements as to #2 Return of Order to Show Cause/IRS Compliance, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and upon request of the Government agrees to a further order directing compliance by September 10, 2018. Respondent Kristen Diers agrees to term of proposed order. Judge Hurd signs order and has respondent served with same in open Court. Appearances: Thomas Spina, Jr., Civil Chief, AUSA for Petitioner United States; Kristen Diers, Respondent (Court Reporter Nancy Freddoso) (10:00am - 10:30am) (ptm) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed on 7/24/2018. (jlb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent Kristen Diers appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York at the Alexander Pirnie Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse at 10 Broad Street in Utica, New York, on the 10th day of August, 2018 at 10 a.m., The United States Marshal, or in the alternative, the District Director of the Internal Revenue Service or his authorized employee, shall serve a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, upon respondent on or before July 24, 2018, Respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/17/2018. (jlb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less