This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:46:19 (UTC).

United States of America v. Currency et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Ott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01297

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Henry Long Nguyen

Defendant

Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay E Town, US Attorney

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

1801 4Th Avenue North, 244-2001

Birmingham, AL 35203-2101

Thomas E Borton, IV

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

1801 4Th Avenue N

Birmingham, AL 35203-2101

Claimant Attorney

Michael P Hanle

Attorney at JAFFE HANLE WHISONANT & KNIGHT PC

2320 Arlington Avenue, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by 10/31/18; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/10/2018. (BST, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash).(Hanle, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward, c/o William Myers, Esq. (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward at Second Address (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Henry Nguyen, c/o Mike Hanle, Esq. (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Warrant for arrest and Notice issued and delivered to USA (KAM) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash), filed by United States of America.(KAM) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by 10/31/18; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/10/2018. (BST, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash).(Hanle, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward, c/o William Myers, Esq. (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward at Second Address (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Henry Nguyen, c/o Mike Hanle, Esq. (Borton, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant for arrest and Notice issued and delivered to USA (KAM) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash), filed by United States of America.(KAM) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.