This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 07:29:31 (UTC).

United States of America v. Currency $550,000, Constituting Funds Held By Or For The Benefit of Dubai Islamic Bank At Standard Chartered Bank, New York, In Lieu Of Up To $550,000, Held In Any Account At Dubai Islamic B

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Currency 550,000, Constituting Funds Held By Or For The Benefit of Dubai Islamic Bank At Standard Chartered Bank, New York, In Lieu Of Up To 550,000, Held In Any Account At Dubai Islamic B. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III, Mona K. Majzoub and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-13791

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judges

Mona K. Majzoub

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Currency $550,000, Constituting Funds Held By Or For The Benefit of Dubai Islamic Bank At Standard Chartered Bank, New York, In Lieu Of Up To $550,000, Held In Any Account At Dubai Islamic B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shankar Ramamurthy

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

211 W. Fort Street, Suite 2001

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America against Currency $550,000, Constituting Funds Held By Or For The Benefit of Dubai Islamic Bank At Standard Chartered Bank, New York, In Lieu Of Up To $550,000, Held In Any Account At Dubai Islamic B with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (ATee) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America against Currency $550,000, Constituting Funds Held By Or For The Benefit of Dubai Islamic Bank At Standard Chartered Bank, New York, In Lieu Of Up To $550,000, Held In Any Account At Dubai Islamic B with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ramamurthy, Shankar) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.