This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2018 at 02:13:39 (UTC).

United States of America v. Champagne et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Champagne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Harmon County Treasurer

Stockmans Bank

Corey Douglas Champagne

Harmon County Board of County Commissioners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kay D Sewell

Attorney at US Attorney's Office-OKC

210 W Park Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

1 #11

Exhibit 11- Security Agreements

1 #12

Exhibit 12- Security Agreements

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against Corey Douglas Champagne, Harmon County Board of County Commissioners, Harmon County Treasurer, Stockmans Bank filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Promissory Note for $70,000.00, #2 Exhibit 2-Promissory Note for $260,000.00, #3 Exhibit 3-Promissory Note for $56,000.00, #4 Exhibit 4-Promissory Note for $50,000.00, #5 Exhibit 5- Promissory Note for $22,500.00, #6 Exhibit 6-Promissory Note for $10,000.00, #7 Exhibit 7-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated June 27, 2013, #8 Exhibit 8- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated April 7, 2015, #9 Exhibit 9- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated October 30, 2015, #10 Exhibit 10-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated January 14, 2016, #11 Exhibit 11- Security Agreements, #12 Exhibit 12- Security Agreements, #13 Exhibit 13- Security Agreements, #14 Exhibit 14- Security Agreements, #15 Exhibit 15- Security Agreements, #16 Exhibit 16- Oklahoma County Clerk, Document No. 20130507020452260 UC1, #17 Exhibit 17- Oklahoma Secretary of State, Document No. 201301630, #18 Exhibit 18- Notice of Acceleration, #19 Exhibit 19- Verification of Indebtedness, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Promissory Note for $260,000.00

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Promissory Note for $70,000.00

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Promissory Note for $56,000.00

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Promissory Note for $50,000.00

1 #5

Exhibit 5- Promissory Note for $22,500.00

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Promissory Note for $10,000.00

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated June 27, 2013

1 #8

Exhibit 8- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated April 7, 2015

1 #9

Exhibit 9- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated October 30, 2015

1 #10

Exhibit 10-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated January 14, 2016

1 #19

Exhibit 19- Verification of Indebtedness

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Exhibit 17- Oklahoma Secretary of State, Document No. 201301630

1 #18

Exhibit 18- Notice of Acceleration

1 #15

Exhibit 15- Security Agreements

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against Corey Douglas Champagne, Harmon County Board of County Commissioners, Harmon County Treasurer, Stockmans Bank filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Promissory Note for $70,000.00, #2 Exhibit 2-Promissory Note for $260,000.00, #3 Exhibit 3-Promissory Note for $56,000.00, #4 Exhibit 4-Promissory Note for $50,000.00, #5 Exhibit 5- Promissory Note for $22,500.00, #6 Exhibit 6-Promissory Note for $10,000.00, #7 Exhibit 7-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated June 27, 2013, #8 Exhibit 8- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated April 7, 2015, #9 Exhibit 9- Mortgage for Oklahoma dated October 30, 2015, #10 Exhibit 10-Mortgage for Oklahoma dated January 14, 2016, #11 Exhibit 11- Security Agreements, #12 Exhibit 12- Security Agreements, #13 Exhibit 13- Security Agreements, #14 Exhibit 14- Security Agreements, #15 Exhibit 15- Security Agreements, #16 Exhibit 16- Oklahoma County Clerk, Document No. 20130507020452260 UC1, #17 Exhibit 17- Oklahoma Secretary of State, Document No. 201301630, #18 Exhibit 18- Notice of Acceleration, #19 Exhibit 19- Verification of Indebtedness, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.