This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2018 at 07:42:29 (UTC).

United States of America v. Carlson et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Carlson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01598

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Charles Harman

Karen L. Carson

Yamhill County, Oregon

Oregon Department of Revenue

Martin J. Strelecky

Teresa A. Strelecky

Julie M. Pettit

Ocwen Financial Corporation

Karen L. Carlson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander Stevko

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel A. Womac

Attorney at The Law Division of Fidelity National Title Group

1200 Sixth Avenue, Suite 620

Seattle, WA 98101

Charles T. Meyer

Attorney at Severson & Werson APC

19100 Von Karman Ave., 7Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Meyer, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #9 of Defendant Julie Pettit with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 15th day of October, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Stipulated Motion for dismissal of defendant Julie Pettit based upon disclaimer of interest. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#7

(#7) Proposed Proposed Order for a Hearing to Show Cause Granting Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance of Daniel A. Womac appearing on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky Filed by on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Karen L. Carlson, Charles Harman, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Oregon Department of Revenue, Julie M. Pettit, Martin J. Strelecky, Teresa A. Strelecky, Yamhill County, Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

3 #8

Proposed Summons

3 #7

Proposed Summons

3 #6

Proposed Summons

3 #5

Proposed Summons

3 #4

Proposed Summons

3 #3

Proposed Summons

3 #2

Proposed Summons

3 #1

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) Amended Complaint . Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant OCWEN Financial Corporation's unopposed motion #11 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint up to and including 11/1/18. (peg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Meyer, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #9 of Defendant Julie Pettit with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 15th day of October, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulated Motion for dismissal of defendant Julie Pettit based upon disclaimer of interest. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendants Strelecky's unopposed motion #6 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plalintiff's amended complaint up to and including 11/19/18. (peg) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Proposed Order for a Hearing to Show Cause Granting Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance of Daniel A. Womac appearing on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky Filed by on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Karen L. Carlson, Charles Harman, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Oregon Department of Revenue, Julie M. Pettit, Martin J. Strelecky, Teresa A. Strelecky, Yamhill County, Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Amended Complaint . Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.