This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 07:55:58 (UTC).

United States of America v. Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Approximately 61,455 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01396

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole M. Andrejko

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM*

Suite 3100, 400 W Washington St

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

Juan De Jesus Gonzalez

Attorney at Law Office of Juan de Jesus Gonzalez, PA

Suite 150, 10631 N Kendall Dr

Miami, FL 33176

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) US Marshal 285 form indicating the arrest in rem of the amount of $61,455 in US Currency. (RDO) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (RDO) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#7

(#7) CLAIM VERIFIED CLAIM AND/OR STATEMENT OF RIGHT OF INTEREST by Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency. (Gonzalez, Juan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Pursuant to Rule G(3)(b)(i), Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is directed to issue the Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/27/2018. (MB) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#8

(#8) PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on Septmeber 12, 2018 and ending on October 11, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 08/24/2018)

8 #1

Attachment 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) NOTICE to counsel (Juan de Jesus Gonzalez) re: Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE to counsel (Juan de Jesus Gonzalez) re: Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on Septmeber 12, 2018 and ending on October 11, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLAIM VERIFIED CLAIM AND/OR STATEMENT OF RIGHT OF INTEREST by Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency. (Gonzalez, Juan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) US Marshal 285 form indicating the arrest in rem of the amount of $61,455 in US Currency. (RDO) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Pursuant to Rule G(3)(b)(i), Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is directed to issue the Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/27/2018. (MB) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (RDO) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $61,455 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.