This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:29:20 (UTC).

United States of America v. $9,688.42 in US Currency et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 9,688 42 in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank R Zapata. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00396

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank R Zapata

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

$9,688.42 in US Currency

$3,718.50 in US Currency

$3,093.90 in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese Valiant Bostwick

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Tucson, AZ

405 W Congress St., Ste. 4800

Tucson, AZ 85701-4050

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Luis Alfonso Acuna, putative claimant of the defendant currency. (SIB) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against Luis Alfonso Acuna. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

6 #2

Advertisement Certification Report

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Service by Publication. Last publication date 09/13/2018 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Advertisement Certification Report)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

5 #2

Notices of Forfeiture Action

5 #1

U.S. Postal Service Form 3811, Domestic Return Receipts

#5

(#5) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, Warrant of Arrest In Rem and Notice of Forfeiture Action upon Luis Alfonso Acuna on 08/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Postal Service Form 3811, Domestic Return Receipts, #2 Notices of Forfeiture Action)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#4

(#4) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem upon $9,688.42 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2002 GMC Sierra 1500, VIN: 1GTEC14T42Z257166, $3,093.90 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2005 Freightliner Columbia 120, VIN: 1FUJA6CK95PU46656, and $3,718.50 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2004 Utility Refrigerated Trailer, VIN: 1UYVS25314U197808 on 08/16/2018. (Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER FORFEITURE/PENALTY: The deadline for completing discovery is 6 months from the date the case is at issue and the deadline for filing dispositive motions is 7 months from the date both an answer and claim are filed (see attached order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/14/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#2

(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frank R Zapata. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-396-TUC-FRZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Bostwick, Reese) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (KAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Luis Alfonso Acuna, putative claimant of the defendant currency. (SIB) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against Luis Alfonso Acuna. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Service by Publication. Last publication date 09/13/2018 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Advertisement Certification Report)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, Warrant of Arrest In Rem and Notice of Forfeiture Action upon Luis Alfonso Acuna on 08/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Postal Service Form 3811, Domestic Return Receipts, #2 Notices of Forfeiture Action)(Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem upon $9,688.42 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2002 GMC Sierra 1500, VIN: 1GTEC14T42Z257166, $3,093.90 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2005 Freightliner Columbia 120, VIN: 1FUJA6CK95PU46656, and $3,718.50 in U.S. currency as substitute res for one 2004 Utility Refrigerated Trailer, VIN: 1UYVS25314U197808 on 08/16/2018. (Bostwick, Reese) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCHEDULING ORDER FORFEITURE/PENALTY: The deadline for completing discovery is 6 months from the date the case is at issue and the deadline for filing dispositive motions is 7 months from the date both an answer and claim are filed (see attached order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/14/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frank R Zapata. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-396-TUC-FRZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Bostwick, Reese) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (KAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.