This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:49:13 (UTC).

United States of America v. $64,018.84 U.S. Currency et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 64,018 84 U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02482

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Dorothy Amor Smith

Daryl Thomas Smith

Defendants

$64,018.84 U.S. Currency

One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693

One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tamera Lynn Fine

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

36 S Charles St Fourth Fl

Baltimore, MD 21201

Claimant Attorney

Robert W Biddle

Attorney at Nathans and Biddle LLP

120 E Baltimore St Ste 1800

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit State v Daryl Smith Plea Transcript

7 #1

Exhibit Redacted Exhibit for ECF #6

#7

(#7) REDACTED DOCUMENT to #6 Claim for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit for ECF #6)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) CLAIM for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit vehicle records)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit Vehicle Records

#5

(#5) CLAIM for Property by Dorothy Amor Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vehicle Records)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Daryl Thomas Smith (Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Dorothy Amor Smith (Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) WARRANT issued to arrest property. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for FORFEITURE against $64,018.84 U.S. Currency, One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693, One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Daryl Thomas Smith, Dorothy Amor Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State v Daryl Smith Plea Transcript)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REDACTED DOCUMENT to #6 Claim for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit for ECF #6)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit vehicle records)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLAIM for Property by Dorothy Amor Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vehicle Records)(Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Daryl Thomas Smith (Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Dorothy Amor Smith (Biddle, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WARRANT issued to arrest property. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for FORFEITURE against $64,018.84 U.S. Currency, One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693, One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.