This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:32:25 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 55,700 00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01058

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

$55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Lew

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

700 Grant Street, Suite 4000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Declaration of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA posted on Internet Site: www.forfeiture.gov for at least 30 days beginning on September 11, 2018. (Lew, David) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER approving #5 Stipulation. Consistent with the Stipulation, this case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/10/18. (dcd) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lew, David) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) US Marshal's Return as to Complaint/Warrant executed on 8/30/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA posted on Internet Site: www.forfeiture.gov for at least 30 days beginning on September 11, 2018. (Lew, David) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER approving #5 Stipulation. Consistent with the Stipulation, this case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/10/18. (dcd) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lew, David) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) US Marshal's Return as to Complaint/Warrant executed on 8/30/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $55,700.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.