This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2018 at 07:51:27 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $33,058.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 33,058 00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02540

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

$33,058.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Debra G. Richards

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Eric Parker Babbs

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER - granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. SAUSA Eric P. Babbs' appearance shall be entered as counsel of record for Plaintiff, the United States of America and that AUSA Debra G. Richards' appearance on its behalf is terminated from the docket. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/28/2018. (NAD) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Substitute Attorney , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property - It is ordered that the United States is to take custody of and to deliver the defendant funds into the possession of the United States Marshals for the Southern District of Indiana, to be detained in the possession of the Marshals until further order of this Court, and you will make return thereon not later than ten (10) days after execution of process. (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/14/2018. Paper copies to USM.(APD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra G. Richards on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Richards, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

1 #2

Warrant For Arrest of Property

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture in Rem against $33,058.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant For Arrest of Property)(Richards, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. SAUSA Eric P. Babbs' appearance shall be entered as counsel of record for Plaintiff, the United States of America and that AUSA Debra G. Richards' appearance on its behalf is terminated from the docket. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/28/2018. (NAD) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Substitute Attorney , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property - It is ordered that the United States is to take custody of and to deliver the defendant funds into the possession of the United States Marshals for the Southern District of Indiana, to be detained in the possession of the Marshals until further order of this Court, and you will make return thereon not later than ten (10) days after execution of process. (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/14/2018. Paper copies to USM.(APD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra G. Richards on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Richards, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture in Rem against $33,058.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant For Arrest of Property)(Richards, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less