This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 07:29:41 (UTC).

United States of America v. $30,260.00 U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 30,260 00 U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01338

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$30,260.00 U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Timothy Bateman

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - STL

111 S. Tenth St., 20Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorney

Jason A. Korner

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JASON A. KORNER

7911 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 300

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#3

(#3) CLAIM filed by claimant Defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency filed by Defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency. (Korner, Jason) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#2

(#2) USMS RETURN OF SERVICE as to $30,260.00 US Currency (KJS) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

1 #3

Warrant

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLAIM filed by claimant Defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency filed by Defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency. (Korner, Jason) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) USMS RETURN OF SERVICE as to $30,260.00 US Currency (KJS) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $30,260.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.