This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 07:41:20 (UTC).

United States of America v. 26.000 Acres of Land, More or Less et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 United States of America filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 26 000 Acres of Land, More or Less. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randy Crane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randy Crane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent

26.000 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Albert Smith, III

Attorney at Office of the US Attorney

800 N Shoreline Blvd, Ste 500

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Megan Hoyt Eyes

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1701 W Bus Hwy 83, Suite 600

Mcallen, TX 78501

Jessica Ashley Nathan

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1701 W Hwy 83, Ste 600

Mcallen, TX 78501

Defendant Attorney

David Champion Garza

Attorney at Garza and Garza

680 E. St. Charles, Suite 300

Brownsville, TX 78520

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION FOR AN ABBREVIATED JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed #14 Motion to Abbreviate the Joint Case Management Plan.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#15

(#15) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent. (Garza, David) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#11

(#11) Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA A. NATHAN on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Nathan, Jessica) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Schedules to Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $100.00, receipt number HOU083812, filed. (gclair, 4) (gclair, 4). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent served on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed #14 Motion to Abbreviate the Joint Case Management Plan.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION FOR AN ABBREVIATED JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent. (Garza, David) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA A. NATHAN on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Nathan, Jessica) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $100.00, receipt number HOU083812, filed. (gclair, 4) (gclair, 4). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent served on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018, filed.(Smith, John) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN EYES on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Eyes, Megan) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Smith, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Smith, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.