This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:19:43 (UTC).

United States of America v. $24,266,300 in United States Currency

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 24,266,300 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07320

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

$24,266,300 in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah Elizabeth Paul

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on August 18, 2018 through September 16, 2018. Document filed by United States of America. (Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/17/2018) (ne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against $24,266,300 in United States Currency. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $24,266,300 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Sarah) Modified on 8/15/2018 (pne). (Entered: 08/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on August 18, 2018 through September 16, 2018. Document filed by United States of America. (Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/17/2018) (ne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against $24,266,300 in United States Currency. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint for Forfeiture. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; if you are filing a Complaint for Forfeiture, the PDF must be titled as such. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/20/2018. (pne) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Paul, Sarah) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $24,266,300 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paul, Sarah) Modified on 8/15/2018 (pne). (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.