This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:18:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 22,310 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02857

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$22,310.00 in U.S. Currency

Interested Party

Michelle K. Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip J. Tripi

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Henry F. DeBaggis, II

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA

Attorney at Former Assistant US Attorney

Defendant and Interested Party Attorney

Myron P. Watson

1144 Rockefeller Bldg., 614 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Department of Treasury Process Receipt and Return

1 #4

Process and Return

#1

(#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in REM, #4 Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Tripi, Phillip) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion for extension of time to answer until 1/22/2019 filed by Michelle K. Moore. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Watson, Myron) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

7 #1

Appendix Answer

1 #5

Notice to Potential Claimant

#7

(#7) Motion for leave to File Answer Instanter filed by Interested Party Michelle K. Moore. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Answer)(Watson, Myron) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

1 #2

Praecipe

1 #3

Warrant of Arrest in REM

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michelle K. Moore on 12/14/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR, document uploaded sideways. Answer filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Watson, Myron) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $22,310.00 in U.S.Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Department of Treasury Process Receipt and Return) (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for leave to File Answer Instanter filed by Interested Party Michelle K. Moore. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Answer)(Watson, Myron) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting #6 Claimant Moore's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for an additional 7 days from the date of this order. Michelle K. Moore answer due 1/29/2019. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/22/2019.(R,Sh) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for extension of time to answer until 1/22/2019 filed by Michelle K. Moore. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Watson, Myron) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/19. (S,AA) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (H,SN) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR, document uploaded sideways. Answer filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Watson, Myron) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michelle K. Moore on 12/14/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Michelle K. Moore placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648271. (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $22,310.00 in U.S.Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Department of Treasury Process Receipt and Return) (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint in Forfeiture against $22,310.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in REM, #4 Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Tripi, Phillip) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.