This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2018 at 07:30:49 (UTC).

United States of America v. 20500 dollars in US Currency

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 20500 dollars in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02084

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

20500 dollars in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrie Fisher Sherard

Attorney at US Attorneys Office (Gville)

55 Beattie Place, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J Kappel

Attorney at Matthew J Kappel Law Office

Po Box 10334

Greenville, SC 29603

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/6/18. (sfla) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#11

(#11) Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America.(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit Verification

#10

(#10) CLAIM Forfeiture Action in Rem (Supplmental Rule G(5)(a) ) by 20500 dollars in US Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/10/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/24/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 9/24/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/18/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2019, Discovery due by 3/21/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/4/2019, Motions due by 4/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/17/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/11/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/21/18. (sfla) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 20500 dollars in US Currency.(Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Kappel on behalf of 20500 dollars in US Currency (Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#5

(#5) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $20,500 in U.S. Currency. (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#4

(#4) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

1 #1

Verification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against 20500 dollars in US Currency filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/6/18. (sfla) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America.(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLAIM Forfeiture Action in Rem (Supplmental Rule G(5)(a) ) by 20500 dollars in US Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/10/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/24/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 9/24/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/18/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2019, Discovery due by 3/21/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/4/2019, Motions due by 4/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/17/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/11/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/21/18. (sfla) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 20500 dollars in US Currency.(Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Kappel on behalf of 20500 dollars in US Currency (Kappel, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $20,500 in U.S. Currency. (Sherard, Carrie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against 20500 dollars in US Currency filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(sfla) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less