Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2018 at 07:29:31 (UTC).

United States of America v. 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692 et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01467

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Eli Abraham

Defendants

Miscellaneous Jewelry

2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen R. Casey

Attorney at OFFICE OF U.S. ATTORNEY

111 S. Tenth Street, 20Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant and Claimant Attorney

Richard Allan Schonfeld

Attorney at CHESNOFF AND SCHONFELD

520 S. 4Th. St.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION to Stay and Joint Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff United States of America shall file its reply to Claimant's response no later than Monday, October 29, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Eli Abraham, Miscellaneous Jewelry.(Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry, Claimant Eli Abraham. (Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Claimant Eli Abraham shall file his response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion, if any, no later than Friday, October 18, 2018. #11 . Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/16/18. (KKS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for November 20, 2018, at 10:00 AM by telephone. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/13/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM in Telephone before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/15/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Return of Property Verified Claim and Demand for Return of Property by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry. (Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#8

(#8) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRita Aramyan, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#7

(#7) MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party servedEli Abraham, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party served Kevin Boles, Type of return Complaint and Notices, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRichard A. Schonfeld, Esq., Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedMiscellaneous Jewelry, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #4

Warrant For Miscellaneous Jewelry

1 #3

Warrant For 2016 Lamborghini Aventador

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, #4 Warrant For Miscellaneous Jewelry)(Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION to Stay and Joint Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff United States of America shall file its reply to Claimant's response no later than Monday, October 29, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Eli Abraham, Miscellaneous Jewelry.(Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry, Claimant Eli Abraham. (Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Claimant Eli Abraham shall file his response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion, if any, no later than Friday, October 18, 2018. #11 . Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/16/18. (KKS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff United States of America. (Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for November 20, 2018, at 10:00 AM by telephone. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/13/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM in Telephone before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/15/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Return of Property Verified Claim and Demand for Return of Property by Defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry. (Schonfeld, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRita Aramyan, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party servedEli Abraham, Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party served Kevin Boles, Type of return Complaint and Notices, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedRichard A. Schonfeld, Esq., Type of return Complaint and Notice, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MARSHAL Return Executed party servedMiscellaneous Jewelry, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MARSHAL Return Executed party served 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Type of return Complaint and Warrant, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendants 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, VIN: ZHWUR1ZDXGLA04692, Miscellaneous Jewelry. (BAK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For 2016 Lamborghini Aventador, #4 Warrant For Miscellaneous Jewelry)(Casey, Stephen) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A Schonfeld