This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 07:57:23 (UTC).

United States of America v. $19,771.00 U.S. currency (PLR1)

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 19,771 00 U S currency PLR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

$19,771.00 U.S. currency

Interested Party

Chase Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anne-Marie Svolto

Attorney at U S Department of Justice (Knox USAO)

800 Market Street, Suite 211

Knoxville, TN 37902

Interested Party Attorney

Robert W White

Attorney at Law Office of the Robert W. White

371 Ellis Avenue

Maryville, TN 37804

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Exhibit B - Advertisement Copy

10 #1

Exhibit A - Advertisement Certification Report

#10

(#10) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 8, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Copy)(Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chase Clark. (White, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Chase Clark served on 8/24/2018. (JBR) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#7

(#7) Verified Claim. (White, Robert) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) Return of Service on Chase Clark c/o Robert W. White, Esq. on 8/13/2018(JBR) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

5 #1

Other Return of Service

#5

(#5) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $19,771.00. (JBR) (Additional attachment(s) provided by USMS and added on 8/21/2018: #1 Other Return of Service) (JBR). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel - Civil cover sheet : (KFB, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by United States of America of filing Amended Warrant of Arrest In Rem (Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by United States of America of Complaint for Forfeiture (Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #2

Other Warrant for Arrest In Rem

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $19,771.00 U.S. currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Warrant for Arrest In Rem)(Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 8, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Copy)(Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chase Clark. (White, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Chase Clark served on 8/24/2018. (JBR) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Verified Claim. (White, Robert) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service on Chase Clark c/o Robert W. White, Esq. on 8/13/2018(JBR) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WARRANT Returned Executed as to $19,771.00. (JBR) (Additional attachment(s) provided by USMS and added on 8/21/2018: #1 Other Return of Service) (JBR). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Administrative Notice to Counsel - Civil cover sheet : (KFB, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • AMENDED WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued. Serviced by hand delivery to USM. (KFB, ) USM 285 form included. (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by United States of America of filing Amended Warrant of Arrest In Rem (Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (KFB, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by United States of America of Complaint for Forfeiture (Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $19,771.00 U.S. currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Warrant for Arrest In Rem)(Svolto, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less