This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:46:55 (UTC).

United States of America v. $1,751.00 in United States Currency et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 1,751 00 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and Dennis Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Donna Lee Watts

Defendants

2003 Chevrolete Silverado (VIN: 1GCHK29183E152488)

$1,751.00 in United States Currency

Chevrolete Silverado 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany Mallory Moore

Attorney at US Attorneys Office

227 W. Trade Street, Suite 1650

Charlotte, NC 28202

Jonathan Douglas Letzring

Attorney at US Attorney's Office, Western District of North Carolin

100 Otis Street, Suite 233

Asheville, NC 28801

Claimant Attorney

Richard E. Cassady

Attorney at The Law Office of Rich Cassady

P.O. Box 2033

Franklin, NC 28744

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication)

#7

(#7) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 20, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by United States of America (Moore, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan Douglas Letzring on behalf of United States of America, Attorney Tiffany Mallory Moore terminated. (Letzring, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Donna Lee Watts.(Cassady, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#3

(#3) USMS Return of Service for Warrant for Arrest In Rem as to $1,751.00 served on USM, entered into JDIS on 9/5/18. (ejb) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#2

(#2) WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property In Rem. (khm) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 20, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • US Attorney advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 10/31/2018. (khm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Settlement by United States of America (Moore, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan Douglas Letzring on behalf of United States of America, Attorney Tiffany Mallory Moore terminated. (Letzring, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/9/2018. (khm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Donna Lee Watts.(Cassady, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) USMS Return of Service for Warrant for Arrest In Rem as to $1,751.00 served on USM, entered into JDIS on 9/5/18. (ejb) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property In Rem. (khm) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.