This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2019 at 08:05:24 (UTC).

United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority, v. A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee et al.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,

United States of America

Defendants

A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee

Nellie Mae Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James S Chase

Tennessee Valley Authority, Office Of General Counsel, 400 West Summit Hill Drive

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Heith Frost

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Roger W Dickson

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

C Crews Townsend

Attorney at Miller & Martin

832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1000 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402-2289

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

20 #1

Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted)

#20

(#20) LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#19

(#19) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service : requirements due by 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by United States of America re #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Nellie Mae Carter. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Nellie Mae Carter. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#16

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#15

(#17) ... disregard filing/wrong case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James) Modified on 1/7/2019 to reflect that filing party informed clerk that they inadvertently filed this doc in wrong case (JAN, ). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #4

Notice of Condemnation

1 #3

Aerial Photograph

1 #2

Declaration of Taking

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee, Nellie Mae Carter, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James) Modified on 11/20/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service : requirements due by 1/14/2019. (AML, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ... disregard filing/wrong case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James) Modified on 1/7/2019 to reflect that filing party informed clerk that they inadvertently filed this doc in wrong case (JAN, ). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by United States of America re #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Nellie Mae Carter (Chase, James) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Description, #2 Exhibit Map)(Chase, James) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Nellie Mae Carter. (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by C Crews Townsend on behalf of Nellie Mae Carter (Townsend, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Memorandum in Support (non-motion) : requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee, Nellie Mae Carter.. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee, Nellie Mae Carter, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James) Modified on 11/20/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.