This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2018 at 07:50:45 (UTC).

United States of America et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Exxon Mobil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Irene M. Keeley and Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Irene M. Keeley

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of West Virginia

United States of America

Defendant

Exxon Mobil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Scott Driver, III

Attorney at WV Dept. of Environmental Protection

601 57Th Street

Charleston, WV 25304

Nathaniel Douglas

Attorney at US Dept. of Justice - ENRD, EES

Po Box 663

Washington, DC 20004-0663

Helen Campbell Altmeyer

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Whg

Po Box 591

Wheeling, WV 26003

Joshua Van Eaton

Attorney at US Dept of Justice - Environmental Enforcement Section

Po Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Laura A. Thoms

Attorney at US Dept of Justice - Environmental Enforcement Section

Po Box 7611, 601 D Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-7611

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM In Support by United States of America re #11 MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) . (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Dkt. No. #7 . Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Laura A. Thoms. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura A. Thoms by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) AMENDED VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Joshua Van Eaton. (jmm) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Nathaniel Douglas and Joshua Van Eaton. (via email) (jmm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

2 #1

Consent Decree

#2

(#2) Notice Of Lodging Of Proposed Consent Decree by State of West Virginia, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(jmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Exxon Mobil Corporation, filed by United States of America, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM In Support by United States of America re #11 MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) . (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • (#10) Case Reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to the case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time. (cmd) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Dkt. No. #7 . Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Laura A. Thoms. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura A. Thoms by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Joshua Van Eaton. (jmm) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission. ERROR: Attorney Nathianiel Douglas added by mistake. CORRECTION: Removed Attorney Douglas and Amended Attorney Verification. (jmm) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Nathaniel Douglas and Joshua Van Eaton. (via email) (jmm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice Of Lodging Of Proposed Consent Decree by State of West Virginia, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(jmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Exxon Mobil Corporation, filed by United States of America, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less