This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 08:04:10 (UTC).

United Specialty Insurance Company v. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 United Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against E-Z Auto Sales, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Wall Street Intermodal, LLC

Safepay Autobrokers, LLC

Kelly Little

Quanariek Roberson

Alexander Lopez Vazquez

Oseas Martinez

Cesar Perez

E-Z Auto Sales, LLC

Great West Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kim M. Jackson

Attorney at Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC

200 Ashford Center North, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30338-2668

David A. Harris

Attorney at Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC

200 Ashford Center North, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30338-2668

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis B. Keene

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

Tracy C. O'Connell

Attorney at Ellis, Painter, Ratterree & Adams, LLP

P.O. Box 9946

Savannah, GA 31412-0146

John Bell Manly

Attorney at Law Office of John B. Manley, P.C.

7 East Congress Street, Suite 600C

Savannah, GA 31401

Jeremy S. McKenzie

Attorney at Karsman, McKenzie & Hart

21 W. Park Avenue

Savannah, GA 31401

Nicholas Shelton Evans

Attorney at Karsman, McKenzie & Hart

21 W. Park Avenue

Savannah, GA 31401

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to E-Z Auto Sales, LLC. (jlh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

29 #1

Affidavit

#29

(#29) MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#28

(#28) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alexander Lopez Vazquez. (thb) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#26

(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

25 #1

Affidavit

#25

(#25) MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#24

(#24) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kelly Little. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to Complaint by Kelly Little.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#4

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

3 #1

Blank forms for new civil case filings

#3

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to E-Z Auto Sales, LLC. (jlh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alexander Lopez Vazquez. (thb) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. E-Z Auto Sales, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk's by United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, David) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kelly Little. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to Complaint by Kelly Little.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Wall Street Intermodal, LLC. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to Complaint by Wall Street Intermodal, LLC.(Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Great West Casualty Company. (Keene, Dennis) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Oseas Martinez answer due 10/9/2018. (thb) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by OSEAS MARTINEZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Cesar Perez answer due 10/4/2018. (thb) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Rule 26(f) Order, #2 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by CESAR PEREZ Acknowledgement filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Harris, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to E-Z Auto Sales, LLC, Great West Casualty Company, Kelly Little, Oseas Martinez, Cesar Perez, Quanariek Roberson, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC, Alexander Lopez Vazquez, Wall Street Intermodal, LLC. (thb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by United Specialty Insurance Company. (thb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J.2445487. (thb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against E-Z Auto Sales, LLC, Great West Casualty Company, Kelly Little, Oseas Martinez, Cesar Perez, Quanariek Roberson, Safepay Autobrokers, LLC, Alexander Lopez Vazquez, Wall Street Intermodal, LLC, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) Modified on 9/12/2018 (thb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (thb). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less