This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2019 at 15:35:23 (UTC).

United Services Automobile Association v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 United Services Automobile Association filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

United Services Automobile Association

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Donald E Tiller

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Jason G Sheasby

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Benjamin W Hattenbach

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Anthony Q Rowles

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Charles Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Lisa Sharrock Glasser

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Andrew J. Strabone

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Counter Defendant, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

James Travis Underwood

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Charlotte

100 N Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Matthew R McCullough

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Michael Andrew Bittner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2501 N Harwood Street, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas M Melsheimer

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2501 N. Harwood Street, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Prachi Viral Mehta

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Chicago

35 W. Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60601

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Jason G Sheasby

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Benjamin W Hattenbach

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Anthony Q Rowles

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Charles Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker Bunt & Ainsworth

100 E Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Lisa Sharrock Glasser

Attorney at Irell & Manella - Newport Beach

840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

James Travis Underwood

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Charlotte

100 N Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Matthew R McCullough

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Michael Andrew Bittner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2501 N Harwood Street, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas M Melsheimer

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2501 N. Harwood Street, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

191 #1

Exhibit 1

#191

(#191) NOTICE by United Services Automobile Association Of Activity In Related Inter Partes Review Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#190

(#190) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Strabone on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7433296. (Strabone, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

146 #3

Exhibit 2

146 #2

Exhibit 1

#146

(#188) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #146 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Trial Testimony of Proffered Patent Law Expert Charles E. Van Horn filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6807332.), filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

706 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) NOTICE by United Services Automobile Association Of Activity In Related Inter Partes Review Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Strabone on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7433296. (Strabone, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#189) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #135 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#188) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #146 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Trial Testimony of Proffered Patent Law Expert Charles E. Van Horn filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#187) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF JOHN VILLASENOR filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#186) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OFTHE EXPERT REPORT OF WILLIAM SAFFICI filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#185) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF CHRISTOPHER GERARDI filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#184) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment Of No Willful Infringement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U)(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#183) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #145 SEALED MOTION To Exclude And/Or Strike Expert Testimony Of Mr. Roy Weinstein filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit I)(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#182) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 SEALED MOTION To Exclude And/Or Strike Relating To The Calman Rebuttal Report filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R McCullough on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (McCullough, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Melsheimer on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 7/30/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..( Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by and through their registered agent Corporation Service Company. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6807332.), filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R McCullough