This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2020 at 16:54:20 (UTC).

United Medical Devices, LLC et al v. Blue Rock Capital, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 United Medical Devices, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blue Rock Capital, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-01255

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants, Defendants and Cross Defendants

United Medical Devices, LLC

Quick Drinks (Pty) Ltd.

United Convenience Supply, LLC

Megacor Investments (Pty) Ltd.

Kiran Sales (Pty) Ltd

Blue Rock Capital, Ltd

Espro Investments, Ltd.

Nicolai Allen

GLENARA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LTD as trustee of the SERABE TRUST

Does 1-50

Jimmy Esebag

Blue Rock Capital, Ltd.

Prashanth Shivnarayan

Nicholai Allen

Petitioner

Anthony B Gordon

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6478

Cross Claimants, Counter Claimants and Defendants

Espro Investments, Ltd.

Blue Rock Capital, Ltd.

Does 1-50

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Michael J Perry

Attorney at Michael J Perry Law Offices

4640 Admiralty Way Suite 500

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Peter W Ross

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles Avrith

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher Kolkey

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Elena Nutenko

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eric M Kennedy

Attorney at Buchalter PC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark T Cramer

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Counter Defendant, Cross Claimant, Counter Claimant, Defendant and Petitioner Attorney

Anthony Bruce Gordon

Attorney at Gordon and Gordon APLC

5550 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 200

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6478

Plaintiff, Cross Claimant, Counter Claimant, Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Eric M Kennedy

Attorney at Buchalter PC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark T Cramer

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Anthony Bruce Gordon

Attorney at Gordon and Gordon APLC

5550 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 200

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6478

Daniel Arkof

Attorney at Buchalter PC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-1730

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Petitioner Attorneys

Michael J Perry

Attorney at Michael J Perry Law Offices

4640 Admiralty Way Suite 500

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Peter W Ross

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles Avrith

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher Kolkey

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Elena Nutenko

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Anthony Bruce Gordon

Attorney at Gordon and Gordon APLC

5550 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 200

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6478

Eric M Kennedy

Attorney at Buchalter PC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark T Cramer

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#177

(#177) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#176

(#176) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants/Defendants Nicholai Allen, Espro Investments, Ltd., United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC.(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#175

(#175) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case called and counsel make their appearance. The Court and counsel confer. Status Conference continued to December 10, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#174

(#174) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter W Ross counsel for Cross Defendants Nicholai Allen, Jimmy Esebag, United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Cross Claimant Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Plaintiffs United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Counter Defendant United Medical Devices, LLC. Christopher M. Kolkey is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs United Medical Devices, LLC, et al.. (Attorney Peter W Ross added to party Blue Rock Capital, Ltd.(pty:crc))(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#173

(#173) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney #169 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The motion was refiled on October 16, 2018. Accordingly Motion #169 is rendered moot. (wm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

171 #1

Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record

169 #2

Proposed Order Granting Buchalter's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

169 #1

Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

#169

(#169) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Eric Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Espro Investments, Ltd., Kiran Sales (Pty) Ltd, Megacor Investments (Pty) Ltd., Quick Drinks (Pty) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Buchalter's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Kennedy, Eric) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC.. (Perry, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#3

(#3) re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Espro Investments, Ltd., Prashant Shivnarayan. (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#1

(#3) re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

355 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#177) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#176) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants/Defendants Nicholai Allen, Espro Investments, Ltd., United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC.(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case called and counsel make their appearance. The Court and counsel confer. Status Conference continued to December 10, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#174) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter W Ross counsel for Cross Defendants Nicholai Allen, Jimmy Esebag, United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Cross Claimant Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Plaintiffs United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Counter Defendant United Medical Devices, LLC. Christopher M. Kolkey is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs United Medical Devices, LLC, et al.. (Attorney Peter W Ross added to party Blue Rock Capital, Ltd.(pty:crc))(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#173) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney #169 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The motion was refiled on October 16, 2018. Accordingly Motion #169 is rendered moot. (wm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#172) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Eric Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney #171 filed by Cross Defendants Nicholai Allen, Jimmy Esebag, United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Counter Defendants United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC, Plaintiffs United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC. (Avrith, Charles) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Eric Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Espro Investments, Ltd., Kiran Sales (Pty) Ltd, Megacor Investments (Pty) Ltd., Quick Drinks (Pty) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, #2 Proposed Order Granting Buchalter's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Kennedy, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#170) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion To Withdraw As Counsel of Record #169 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#169) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Eric Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Espro Investments, Ltd., Kiran Sales (Pty) Ltd, Megacor Investments (Pty) Ltd., Quick Drinks (Pty) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Kennedy ISO Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Buchalter's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Kennedy, Eric) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#168) MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having heard from counsel, continues the Status Conference to November 19, 2018 at 2:30pm. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs United Convenience Supply, LLC, United Medical Devices, LLC.. (Perry, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Does 1-50, Espro Investments, Ltd., Prashanth Shivnarayan, filed by Plaintiffs United Medical Devices, LLC, United Convenience Supply, LLC. Submitted attached Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Espro Investments, Ltd., Prashant Shivnarayan. (Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: 0973-17339506 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Blue Rock Capital, Ltd., Prashant Shivnarayan, Espro Investments, Ltd.. (Attorney Anthony Bruce Gordon added to party Blue Rock Capital, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Bruce Gordon added to party Espro Investments, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Bruce Gordon added to party Prashant Shivnarayan(pty:dft))(Gordon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Convenience Supply, LLC is a litigant