This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2019 at 07:43:41 (UTC).

United Fire & Casualty Company v. Bismarck, City of

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 United Fire Casualty Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bismarck, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Fire & Casualty Company

Defendant

Bismarck, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph A. Nilan

Attorney at Gregerson Rosow Johnson & Nilan LTD

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Defendant Attorney

Chris A. Edison

Attorney at Bormann, Myerchin & Espeseth, LLP

Po Box 995

Bismarck, ND 58502-0995

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Bismarck, City of answer due 3/4/2019. (rh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #9 Stipulation filed by Bismarck, City of by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Defendant's answer shall be due 3/4/2019.(GD) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #4 Amended Complaint for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bismarck, City of. (Edison, Chris) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Docket(#8) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris A. Edison on behalf of Bismarck, City of (Edison, Chris) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by United Fire & Casualty Company. Bismarck, City of served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Nilan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Fire & Casualty Company re #4 Amended Complaint (Nilan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bismarck, City of filed by United Fire & Casualty Company.(Nilan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent United Fire Group, Inc. for United Fire & Casualty Company. (cjs) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Bismarck, City of. (cjs) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bismarck, City of (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000380) filed by United Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Fire & Casualty company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Nilan