This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 07:27:04 (UTC).

Underwood v. City of Minneapolis

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Underwood filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Minneapolis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02884

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loren Underwood

Defendants

Minneapolis Police Officers

City of Minneapolis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. L. Brown

Attorney at Capitol City Law Group, LLC

287 East Sixth Street, Suite 20

Saint Paul, MN 55101

Joshua R Williams

Attorney at Law Office of Joshua R. Williams

2836 Lyndale Avenue South, Suite 160

Minneapolis, MN 55408

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Scott Carter

Attorney at Minneapolis City Attorney's Office

350 South Fifth Street, Room 210

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Burt T Osborne

Attorney at Minneapolis City Attorney's Office

350 South 5Th Street - Room 210

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#12

(#12) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by City of Minneapolis . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Carter, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Williams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/27/2018. The Court will schedule a follow-up conference by telephone with counsel before issuing a Pretrial Scheduling Order. (JMK) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Loren Underwood.(Carter, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER Resetting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - TIME CHANGE ONLY: Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/9/2018. (JMK) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (JMK) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis. (Osborne, Burt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Burt T Osborne on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Osborne, Burt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Summons and Complaint Complaint

1 #1

Summons and Complaint Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number unknown (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6417578) filed by City of Minneapolis. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons, #2 Summons and Complaint Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by City of Minneapolis . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Carter, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Williams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 conference at 8:00 a.m. on DECEMBER 11, 2018 to discuss a proposed schedule for the initial phase of discovery, including a "served, filed, and heard" deadline for any motion for summary judgment pertaining to Mr. Underwood's individual claims, and any other matters that should be addressed. The parties shall meet and confer and e-file a joint letter with their proposed schedule on or before DECEMBER 7, 2018. Chambers will initiate the conference call, and the parties shall include in their update letter the names and phone numbers for counsel who will participate in that call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/28/2018. (JMK) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/27/2018. The Court will schedule a follow-up conference by telephone with counsel before issuing a Pretrial Scheduling Order. (JMK) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Loren Underwood.(Carter, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Resetting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - TIME CHANGE ONLY: Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/9/2018. (JMK) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (JMK) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis. (Osborne, Burt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Burt T Osborne on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Osborne, Burt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2884 (PJS/HB). (MMP) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number unknown (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6417578) filed by City of Minneapolis. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons, #2 Summons and Complaint Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.