This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 19:05:52 (UTC).

Underground Toys USA, LLC v. Vorka

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 Underground Toys USA, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Vorka. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger T. Benitez

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Underground Toys USA, LLC

Underground Toys USA, LLC a California corporation doing business as seven20

Defendants

Does 1 through 20

Georgios Vorka

George Vorka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip L Kossy

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street,, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/15/2018. (anh) (sjt). (Entered: 08/15/2018)

13 #1

Proof of Service

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (acc). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

10 #1

Proof of Service

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Underground Toys USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/23/2018)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) DECLARATION re #8 Notice of Hearing - Dismissal per LR 41.1 by Plaintiff Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#8

(#8) Notice of Hearing - Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41.1. Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41.1 Hearing set for 7/23/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (gxr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

7 #1

Proof of Service

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

6 #2

Proof of Service

6 #1

Notice Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Benjamin Price - Counsel for Plaintiff on May 14, 2018 by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 05/16/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint. Plaintiff shall effect service of its summons and complaint on Defendant on or before 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/15/2018. (anh) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

4 #3

Proof of Service

#4

(#4) Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Service of Complaint by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (rmc). (Entered: 04/12/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Georgios Vorka ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10808741), filed by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-86-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Kossy, Phillip)(tcf) (sjt). (Entered: 01/16/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/15/2018. (anh) (sjt). (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (acc). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The parties recently filed a Notice of Settlement. [Doc. No. 10]. Accordingly, a telephonic, counsel-only, Settlement Disposition Conference has been set for 9/7/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Counsel for plaintiff shall call Judge Crawford's chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line. The Court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 9/7/18.(no document attached) (egs) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • (#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41.1 held on 7/23/2018. The parties represented that they had reached a settlement and were in the process of finalizing the agreement. The parties agreed to file a notice of settlement and represented their intent to file a motion or stipulation for dismissal by no later than August 6, 2018.(Court Reporter/ECR Amamda LeGore). (Plaintiff Attorney Phillip L. Kossy). (Defendant Attorney Cameron B. Gordon). (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Underground Toys USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION re #8 Notice of Hearing - Dismissal per LR 41.1 by Plaintiff Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Hearing - Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41.1. Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to LR 41.1 Hearing set for 7/23/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (gxr) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Benjamin Price - Counsel for Plaintiff on May 14, 2018 by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint. Plaintiff shall effect service of its summons and complaint on Defendant on or before 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/15/2018. (anh) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Service of Complaint by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Kossy, Phillip) (rmc). (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Underground Toys USA, LLC . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Kossy, Phillip) (anh). (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Georgios Vorka ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10808741), filed by Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-86-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Kossy, Phillip)(tcf) (sjt). (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less