This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2019 at 07:14:40 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. iBus Media Limited et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against iBus Media Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and S. James Otero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-09709

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC

Universal Music Corp.

Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC

Songs of Universal Music, Inc.

Polygram Publishing, Inc.

Capitol Records, LLC

Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Universal Music MGB NA LLC

Universal Music Z Tunes LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

iBus Media Limited

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Michael Wais

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

11377 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

Bradley J Mullins

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

11377 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

David A Steinberg

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp

11377 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Polygram Publishing, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal Music, Inc., upon Defendant iBus Media Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Lee, Receptionist. (Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 ) mailed to iBus Media Limited, 33-37 Athol Street, Douglas Isle of Man IM IM1 1LB on 12/13/18 (lc) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant iBus Media Limited. (jtil) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., identifying Plaintiffs UMG Recordings, Inc.; Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC; Capitol Records, LLC; Universal Music Corp.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; PolyGram Publishing, Inc.; Universal Music MGB NA LLC; Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, and Vivendi, S.A., the ultimate parent company of Plaintiffs; Defendant iBus Media Limited. (Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22760494 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Polygram Publishing, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal Music, Inc.. (Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Polygram Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Songs of Universal Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music Corp.(pty:pla))(Wais, Aaron) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roc-A-Fella Records LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Polygram Publishing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC is a litigant