This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2018 at 07:46:50 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Grande Communications Networks LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Grande Communications Networks LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MC-00613

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fonovisa, Inc.

Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

Arista Music

Zomba Recording LLC

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

Rhino Entertainment Company

Arista Records LLC

Warner Bros. Records Inc.

Tooth & Nail, LLC

LaFace Records LLC

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc.

Fueled by Ramen LLC

Sony Music Entertainment

Capitol Records, LLC

Defendants and Petitioners

Grande Communication Networks LLC

Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.

Grande Communications Networks LLC

Respondent

Recording Industry Association of America

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Robert B. Gilmore

Attorney at Stein Mitchell Cipollone Beato & Missner LLP

1100 Connecticut Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Philip J. O'Beirne

Attorney at Stein Mitchell Cipollone Beato & Missner LLP

1100 Connecticut Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Daniel C. Bitting

Attorney at Scott, Douglas & McConnico, L.L.P.

303 Colorado St., Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Pasquale A. Cipollone

Attorney at Stein Mitchell Cipollone Beato & Missner LLP

1100 Connecticut Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Jonathan E. Missner

Attorney at Stein Mitchell Cipollone Beato & Missner LLP

1100 Connecticut Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Petitioner Attorney

David M. Ross

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

700 11Th Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorneys

Richard L. Brophy

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Jennifer E. Hoekel

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

J. Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Zachary C. Howenstine

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Margaret R. Szewczyk

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

John R. Johnson

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Nicholas B. Clifford

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Diana L. Nichols

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

301 Congress Avenue, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

7 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case electronically transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-mc-00090. (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The #6 Motion is GRANTED; and 2) The case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/16/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Motion to Compel, Proposed Order, Disclosure Statement (Docket Nos. 1-3) (Service Date July 12, 2018) by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC. (Ross, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Full Case Management. (zsth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING case to Magistrate Judge for full case management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/10/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Proposed Order by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC re #1 Motion to Compel (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Compel ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 4616093436.) filed by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC.(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.] (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tooth & Nail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Grande Communications Networks LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Roc-A-Fella Records LLC is a litigant