This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 16:06:47 (UTC).

UMB Bank, N.A. v. Sanofi

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 UMB Bank, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sanofi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George B. Daniels and Robert W. Lehrburger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-08725

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Robert W. Lehrburger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC

UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee

Defendant

Sanofi

Interested Parties

Elliott International, LP

Rangeley Capital Partners, LP

CSS, LLC

Elliott Management Corporation

ELS Advisory Corporation

Whitebox Advisors LLC

PBB Investments I, LLC

Mason Capital Management LLC

Whitebox GT Fund, LP

Lorin Capital Master Fund, LP

Stonehill Institutional Partners, LP

Tortus Capital Management, LLC

The Liverpool Limited Partnership

Pandora Select Partners, LP

Foxhill Opportunity Fund, LP

Halis Family Foundation

Chimney Rock Investments, LLC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Penski Fissell

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Mario Lucero

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Stacey Jill Rappaport

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Michael Brenner Weiss

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Brent Lloyd Andrus

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Charles Alan Gilman

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Alison Bonelli

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Ariel Lavinbuk

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP

2000 K St., Nw, Ste 4Thh Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel Robert Lecours

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Tammy Lynn Roy

Attorney at Cahill Gordon et ano.

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Margaret Ann Barone

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Adam Shawn Mintz

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Jonathan David Thier

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Caroline Saucier

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Neuwirth

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue, 25Th Fl.

New York, NY 10153

Stefania Di Trolio Venezia

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue, 25Th Fl.

New York, NY 10153

Joshua Sanders Amsel

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Interested Party Attorneys

David Parker

Attorney at Kleinberg,Kaplan,Wolff & Cohen,P.C.

551 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10176

Joshua Kallman Bromberg

Attorney at Kleinberg,Kaplan,Wolff & Cohen,P.C.

551 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10176

Steven Robert Paradise

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

200 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10281-1003

 

Court Documents

#257

(#257) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Charles A. Gilman dated September 13, 2019 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee.(Mintz, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

256 #298

Exhibit 298 - Filed Under Seal

256 #269

Exhibit 269 - Cerezyme.com

256 #268

Exhibit 268 - Filed Under Seal

256 #267

Exhibit 267 - Filed Under Seal

256 #266

Exhibit 266 - Filed Under Seal

256 #263

Exhibit 263 - Filed Under Seal

256 #243

Exhibit 243 - Filed Under Seal

256 #242

Exhibit 242 - Filed Under Seal

5 #2

Exhibit B - Advisory Committee Transcript

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against Sanofi. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CVR Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Advisory Committee Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Briefing Materials)(Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Armor Holding II LLC for American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC.(Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Briefing Materials

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Advisory Committee Transcript

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - CVR Agreement

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

800 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#257) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Charles A. Gilman dated September 13, 2019 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee.(Mintz, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#256) DECLARATION of Adam S. Mintz in Support re: #245 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I, II and VII of the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contingent Value Rights Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - UMB Financial Corporation Website, #3 Exhibit 3 - About Us, Sanofi Website, #4 Exhibit 4 - Investors Contacts, Sanofi Website, #5 Exhibit 5 - About Us, Sanofi Genzyme Website, #6 Exhibit 6 - Genzyme Confirms Receipt of Unsolicited Proposal, Sanofi Genzyme Website, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Genzyme Corporation, Solicitation Recommendation Statement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, #11 Exhibit 11 - Sanofi-Aventis Successfully Completes Exchange Offer for Genzyme Corporation, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sanofi to Buy Genzyme for more than $20 Billion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14 - Sanofis Prospectus Filed Pursuant to Rule 424(b)(3), #15 Exhibit 15 - Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 16 - Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 18 - Sanofi Form 20-F 2012, #19 Exhibit 19 - Questions and Answers Regarding the CVR, #20 Exhibit 20 - Sanofi Form 20-F 2018, #21 Exhibit 21 - Sanofi Form 20-F 2016, #22 Exhibit 22 - Sanofi Form 20-F 2013, #23 Exhibit 23 - Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 24 - Lemtrada Full Prescribing Information, #25 Exhibit 25 - October 18, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Olivier Brandicourt, #26 Exhibit 26 - August 29, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Christopher Viehbacher, #27 Exhibit 27 - Filed Under Seal, #28 Exhibit 28 - Filed Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 29 - Filed Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 30 - Filed Under Seal, #31 Exhibit 31 - Filed Under Seal, #32 Exhibit 32 - Filed Under Seal, #33 Exhibit 33 - Filed Under Seal, #34 Exhibit 34 - Aubagio Full Prescribing Information, #35 Exhibit 35 - Article re Teriflunomide, #36 Exhibit 36 - FORBES Article, #37 Exhibit 37 - October 18, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Serge Weinberg, #38 Exhibit 38 - REUTERS article, #39 Exhibit 39 - November 7, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Elias Zerhouni, #40 Exhibit 40 - REUTERS article, #41 Exhibit 41 - Sanofi Appoints David Meeker Chief Executive Officer of Genzyme, Sanofi Genzyme Website, #42 Exhibit 42 - July 26, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of David Meeker, #43 Exhibit 43 - June 14, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Marc Esteva, #44 Exhibit 44 - Bill Sibold, Executive Vice President and Head of Sanofi Genzyme bio, #45 Exhibit 45 - Bill Sibold, LinkedIn, #46 Exhibit 46 - July 31, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Mark Underwood, #47 Exhibit 47 - Mark Underwood, LinkedIn, #48 Exhibit 48 - Stephen Lake, LinkedIn, #49 Exhibit 49 - November 16, 2017 Videotaped Deposition of Stephen Lake, #50 Exhibit 50 - Michael Panzara, LinkedIn, #51 Exhibit 51 - October 24, 2017 Videotaped Deposition of Michael Panzara, #52 Exhibit 52 - November 1, 2017 Videotaped Deposition of Jennifer Panagoulias, #53 Exhibit 53 - Tom Snow, LinkedIn, #54 Exhibit 54 - Carole Huntsman, LinkedIn, #55 Exhibit 55 - September 5, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Jerome Contamine, #56 Exhibit 56 - July 17, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of William J. Sibold, #57 Exhibit 57 - June 22, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Thomas Snow, #58 Exhibit 58 - May 8, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Carole Huntsman, #59 Exhibit 59 - Plaintiff UMB Bank, N.A., as Trustee's Responses and Objections to Defendants First Set of Requests for Admission, #60 Exhibit 60 - Filed Under Seal, #61 Exhibit 61 - Filed Under Seal, #62 Exhibit 62 - Filed Under Seal, #63 Exhibit 63 - Filed Under Seal, #64 Exhibit 64 - Filed Under Seal, #65 Exhibit 65 - Filed Under Seal, #66 Exhibit 66 - Filed Under Seal, #67 Exhibit 67 - Filed Under Seal, #68 Exhibit 68 - Filed Under Seal, #69 Exhibit 69 - Filed Under Seal, #70 Exhibit 70 - Filed Under Seal, #71 Exhibit 71 - Filed Under Seal, #72 Exhibit 72 - Filed Under Seal, #73 Exhibit 73 - Filed Under Seal, #74 Exhibit 74 - Filed Under Seal, #75 Exhibit 75 - Filed Under Seal, #76 Exhibit 76 - Filed Under Seal, #77 Exhibit 77 - Filed Under Seal, #78 Exhibit 78 - Filed Under Seal, #79 Exhibit 79 - Filed Under Seal, #80 Exhibit 80 - Filed Under Seal, #81 Exhibit 81 - Filed Under Seal, #82 Exhibit 82 - Filed Under Seal, #83 Exhibit 83 - Filed Under Seal, #84 Exhibit 84 - Filed Under Seal, #85 Exhibit 85 - Filed Under Seal, #86 Exhibit 86 - Filed Under Seal, #87 Exhibit 87 - Filed Under Seal, #88 Exhibit 88 - Filed Under Seal, #89 Exhibit 89 - Filed Under Seal, #90 Exhibit 90 - Filed Under Seal, #91 Exhibit 91 - Filed Under Seal, #92 Exhibit 92 - Filed Under Seal, #93 Exhibit 93 - Filed Under Seal, #94 Exhibit 94 - Filed Under Seal, #95 Exhibit 95 - Filed Under Seal, #96 Exhibit 96 - Filed Under Seal, #97 Exhibit 97 - Filed Under Seal, #98 Exhibit 98 - Filed Under Seal, #99 Exhibit 99 - Filed Under Seal, #100 Exhibit 100 - Filed Under Seal, #101 Exhibit 101 - Filed Under Seal, #102 Exhibit 102 - Filed Under Seal, #103 Exhibit 103 - Filed Under Seal, #104 Exhibit 104 - Filed Under Seal, #105 Exhibit 105 - Filed Under Seal, #106 Exhibit 106 - Filed Under Seal, #107 Exhibit 107 - Filed Under Seal, #108 Exhibit 108 - Filed Under Seal, #109 Exhibit 109 - Filed Under Seal, #110 Exhibit 110 - Filed Under Seal, #111 Exhibit 111 - Filed Under Seal, #112 Exhibit 112 - Filed Under Seal, #113 Exhibit 113 - Filed Under Seal, #114 Exhibit 114 - Filed Under Seal, #115 Exhibit 115 - May 3, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Pamela Williamson, #116 Exhibit 116 - Filed Under Seal, #117 Exhibit 117 - Filed Under Seal, #118 Exhibit 118 - Filed Under Seal, #119 Exhibit 119 - Filed Under Seal, #120 Exhibit 120 - Filed Under Seal, #121 Exhibit 121 - Filed Under Seal, #122 Exhibit 122 - Primary Progressive MS (PPMS), National Multiple Sclerosis Society, #123 Exhibit 123 - Filed Under Seal, #124 Exhibit 124 - Filed Under Seal, #125 Exhibit 125 - Filed Under Seal, #126 Exhibit 126 - Filed Under Seal, #127 Exhibit 127 - Filed Under Seal, #128 Exhibit 128 - Filed Under Seal, #129 Exhibit 129 - Filed Under Seal, #130 Exhibit 130 - Filed Under Seal, #131 Exhibit 131 - FDA approves new drug to treat multiple sclerosis, #132 Exhibit 132 - Roche's Ocrevus continues winning streak as NICE flip-flops on initial rejection, #133 Exhibit 133 - Filed Under Seal, #134 Exhibit 134 - Filed Under Seal, #135 Exhibit 135 - Filed Under Seal, #136 Exhibit 136 - Filed Under Seal, #137 Exhibit 137 - Filed Under Seal, #138 Exhibit 138 - Filed Under Seal, #139 Exhibit 139 - Filed Under Seal, #140 Exhibit 140 - Filed Under Seal, #141 Exhibit 141 - Development & Approval Process (Drugs), U.S. Food & Drug Administration, #142 Exhibit 142 - Filed Under Seal, #143 Exhibit 143 - Filed Under Seal, #144 Exhibit 144 - Filed Under Seal, #145 Exhibit 145 - Open Label Study, National Cancer Institute, #146 Exhibit 146 - Blind Study, Medical Dictionary, #147 Exhibit 147 - Filed Under Seal, #148 Exhibit 148 - Filed Under Seal, #149 Exhibit 149 - FDA Licensing Rule, #150 Exhibit 150 - FDA Licensing Rule, #151 Exhibit 151 - Filed Under Seal, #152 Exhibit 152 - FDA Applications, #153 Exhibit 153 - Filed Under Seal, #154 Exhibit 154 - Filed Under Seal, #155 Exhibit 155 - Filed Under Seal, #156 Exhibit 156 - Filed Under Seal, #157 Exhibit 157 - Filed Under Seal, #158 Exhibit 158 - Filed Under Seal, #159 Exhibit 159 - Filed Under Seal, #160 Exhibit 160 - Filed Under Seal, #161 Exhibit 161 - Filed Under Seal, #162 Exhibit 162 - Genzyme Receives Complete Response Letter from FDA on Lemtrada (alemtuzumab) Application, #163 Exhibit 163 - Filed Under Seal, #164 Exhibit 164 - Filed Under Seal, #165 Exhibit 165 - Genzymes Lemtrada Approved by the FDA, Sanofi Genzyme Website, #166 Exhibit 166 - Filed Under Seal, #167 Exhibit 167 - Filed Under Seal, #168 Exhibit 168 - Statistical Review and Evaluation, Clinical Studies, #169 Exhibit 169 - Filed Under Seal, #170 Exhibit 170 - Filed Under Seal, #171 Exhibit 171 - Filed Under Seal, #172 Exhibit 172 - EDSS variability before randomization may limit treatment discovery in primary progressive MS, #173 Exhibit 173 - Filed Under Seal, #174 Exhibit 174 - Filed Under Seal, #175 Exhibit 175 - Filed Under Seal, #176 Exhibit 176 - Filed Under Seal, #177 Exhibit 177 - Filed Under Seal, #178 Exhibit 178 - Filed Under Seal, #179 Exhibit 179 - Filed Under Seal, #180 Exhibit 180 - Filed Under Seal, #181 Exhibit 181 - Filed Under Seal, #182 Exhibit 182 - Filed Under Seal, #183 Exhibit 183 - Filed Under Seal, #184 Exhibit 184 - Filed Under Seal, #185 Exhibit 185 - Filed Under Seal, #186 Exhibit 186 - Filed Under Seal, #187 Exhibit 187 - Filed Under Seal, #188 Exhibit 188 - Filed Under Seal, #189 Exhibit 189 - Filed Under Seal, #190 Exhibit 190 - Filed Under Seal, #191 Exhibit 191 - Filed Under Seal, #192 Exhibit 192 - Filed Under Seal, #193 Exhibit 193 - Filed Under Seal, #194 Exhibit 194 - Filed Under Seal, #195 Exhibit 195 - Filed Under Seal, #196 Exhibit 196 - Commision de la Transparence, #197 Exhibit 197 - Filed Under Seal, #198 Exhibit 198 - Filed Under Seal, #199 Exhibit 199 - Filed Under Seal, #200 Exhibit 200 - Filed Under Seal, #201 Exhibit 201 - Filed Under Seal, #202 Exhibit 202 - Filed Under Seal, #203 Exhibit 203 - Filed Under Seal, #204 Exhibit 204 - Filed Under Seal, #205 Exhibit 205 - Filed Under Seal, #206 Exhibit 206 - Filed Under Seal, #207 Exhibit 207 - Filed Under Seal, #208 Exhibit 208 - Filed Under Seal, #209 Exhibit 209 - Filed Under Seal, #210 Exhibit 210 - Filed Under Seal, #211 Exhibit 211 - Filed Under Seal, #212 Exhibit 212 - Filed Under Seal, #213 Exhibit 213 - Filed Under Seal, #214 Exhibit 214 - Filed Under Seal, #215 Exhibit 215 - Filed Under Seal, #216 Exhibit 216 - Filed Under Seal, #217 Exhibit 217 - Filed Under Seal, #218 Exhibit 218 - Filed Under Seal, #219 Exhibit 219 - Filed Under Seal, #220 Exhibit 220 - Filed Under Seal, #221 Exhibit 221 - Filed Under Seal, #222 Exhibit 222 - Filed Under Seal, #223 Exhibit 223 - Filed Under Seal, #224 Exhibit 224 - Filed Under Seal, #225 Exhibit 225 - Filed Under Seal, #226 Exhibit 226 - Filed Under Seal, #227 Exhibit 227 - Filed Under Seal, #228 Exhibit 228 - Filed Under Seal, #229 Exhibit 229 - Filed Under Seal, #230 Exhibit 230 - Filed Under Seal, #231 Exhibit 231 - Filed Under Seal, #232 Exhibit 232 - Filed Under Seal, #233 Exhibit 233 - Filed Under Seal, #234 Exhibit 234 - Filed Under Seal, #235 Exhibit 235 - Filed Under Seal, #236 Exhibit 236 - Filed Under Seal, #237 Exhibit 237 - Filed Under Seal, #238 Exhibit 238 - Filed Under Seal, #239 Exhibit 239 - Filed Under Seal, #240 Exhibit 240 - Filed Under Seal, #241 Exhibit 241 - Filed Under Seal, #242 Exhibit 242 - Filed Under Seal, #243 Exhibit 243 - Filed Under Seal, #244 Exhibit 244 - Filed Under Seal, #245 Exhibit 245 - Filed Under Seal, #246 Exhibit 246 - Filed Under Seal, #247 Exhibit 247 - Filed Under Seal, #248 Exhibit 248 - Filed Under Seal, #249 Exhibit 249 - Filed Under Seal, #250 Exhibit 250 - Filed Under Seal, #251 Exhibit 251 - Filed Under Seal, #252 Exhibit 252 - Filed Under Seal, #253 Exhibit 253 - Filed Under Seal, #254 Exhibit 254 - The bright side to Sanofi's Lemtrada delay_ Its support-to-sell marketing plan, #255 Exhibit 255 - Filed Under Seal, #256 Exhibit 256 - Filed Under Seal, #257 Exhibit 257 - Filed Under Seal, #258 Exhibit 258 - Filed Under Seal, #259 Exhibit 259 - Filed Under Seal, #260 Exhibit 260 - Filed Under Seal, #261 Exhibit 261 - Filed Under Seal, #262 Exhibit 262 - Filed Under Seal, #263 Exhibit 263 - Filed Under Seal, #264 Exhibit 264 - Filed Under Seal, #265 Exhibit 265 - Filed Under Seal, #266 Exhibit 266 - Filed Under Seal, #267 Exhibit 267 - Filed Under Seal, #268 Exhibit 268 - Filed Under Seal, #269 Exhibit 269 - Cerezyme.com, #270 Exhibit 270 - NIH - Gaucher Disease, #271 Exhibit 271 - What Is Gaucher Disease, #272 Exhibit 272 - Proposed Text of The Labeling of the Drug Cerezyme, #273 Exhibit 273 - Fabrazyme, #274 Exhibit 274 - What is Fabry Disease, #275 Exhibit 275 - Filed Under Seal, #276 Exhibit 276 - Press Release, #277 Exhibit 277 - Filed Under Seal, #278 Exhibit 278 - Filed Under Seal, #279 Exhibit 279 - Filed Under Seal, #280 Exhibit 280 - Filed Under Seal, #281 Exhibit 281 - Filed Under Seal, #282 Exhibit 282 - Filed Under Seal, #283 Exhibit 283 - Filed Under Seal, #284 Exhibit 284 - Filed Under Seal, #285 Exhibit 285 - Filed Under Seal, #286 Exhibit 286 - October 12, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of William Aitchison, #287 Exhibit 287 - August 29, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Sandra Poole, #288 Exhibit 288 - Filed Under Seal, #289 Exhibit 289 - Filed Under Seal, #290 Exhibit 290 - October 19, 2018 Videotaped Deposition of Martin Solberg, #291 Exhibit 291 - Filed Under Seal, #292 Exhibit 292 - Filed Under Seal, #293 Exhibit 293 - Filed Under Seal, #294 Exhibit 294 - Filed Under Seal, #295 Exhibit 295 - Filed Under Seal, #296 Exhibit 296 - Filed Under Seal, #297 Exhibit 297 - Filed Under Seal, #298 Exhibit 298 - Filed Under Seal, #299 Exhibit 299 - Filed Under Seal, #300 Exhibit 300 - Filed Under Seal, #301 Exhibit 301 - Instrument of Appointment, #302 Exhibit 302 - Form F-4 Excerpts)(Mintz, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#255) DECLARATION of Joshua S. Amsel in Support re: #253 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Sanofi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Documents Sought To Be Filed Under Seal)(Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#254) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #253 MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Sanofi. (Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#253) MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Sanofi.(Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#252) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #248 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I, II, and VII of the Second Amended Complaint. [CORRECTED]. Document filed by Sanofi. (Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#251) DECLARATION of Stefania D. Venezia in Support re: #248 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I, II, and VII of the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Sanofi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Edwards Expert Report Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Edwards Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - Chin Expert Report Excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Chin Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #5 Exhibit E - Blum Expert Report Excerpt, #6 Exhibit F - Caeser Expert Report Excerpt, #7 Exhibit G - Slovick Expert Report Excerpt, #8 Exhibit H - Slovick Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #9 Exhibit I - Phillips Expert Report Excerpt, #10 Exhibit J - Smolin Expert Report Excerpt, #11 Exhibit K - Smolin Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #12 Exhibit L - Phillips Expert Report Excerpt, #13 Exhibit M - Form 20-F Excerpt, #14 Exhibit N- November 14, 2014 Press Release)(Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#250) RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Sanofi. (Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#249) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #248 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I, II, and VII of the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Sanofi. (Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#248) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I, II, and VII of the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sanofi.(Neuwirth, John) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stacey Jill Rappaport. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); Dollar Demand $236,421,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $236,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against Sanofi. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CVR Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Advisory Committee Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Briefing Materials)(Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Armor Holding II LLC for American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC.(Rappaport, Stacey) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11603614)Document filed by American Stock Transfer & Trust Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - CVR Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Advisory Committee Transcript, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Briefing Materials)(Rappaport, Stacey) Modified on 11/9/2015 (pc). (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stacey Jill Rappaport to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/12/2015. (rch) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMB Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Whitebox Advisors LLC is a litigant