Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2019 at 07:25:34 (UTC).

UDEEN et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 UDEEN filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Joel Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-17334

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAD UDEEN

MARY JANE JEFFERY

GARY GILPIN

MICHAEL BOLICK

ALICIA SMITH

SUSAN WILLIAMS

LYDIA RUNKEL

Defendants

SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.

FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN F. JOHNS

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

One Haverford Centre, 361 West Lancaster Avenue

Haverford, PA 19041

J. LLEWELLYN MATHEWS

Attorney at EAST GATE CENTER

309 Fellowship Road, Suite 200

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

KEVIN PETER RODDY

Attorney at WILENTZ, GOLDMAN & SPITZER, PA

90 Woodbridge Center Drive, Suite 900, Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

ALEX M. KASHURBA

Attorney at CHIMICLES SCHWARTZ KRINER & DONALDSON-SMITH LLP

361 W. Lancaster Avenue

Haverford, PA 19041

DANIEL R. LAPINSKI

Attorney at WILENTZ, GOLDMAN & SPITZER, PC

90 Woodbridge Center Drive, Suite 900, Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

ANDREW W. FERICH

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

361 West Lancaster Avenue

Haveford, PA 19041

Defendant Attorneys

NEAL D. WALTERS

Attorney at BALLARD, SPAHR LLP

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-1163

CASEY GENE WATKINS

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 2/15/2019 on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

24 #2

Exhibit 2

24 #1

Exhibit 1

#24

(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT -- FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against LYDIA RUNKEL, MICHAEL BOLICK, GARY GILPIN, ALICIA SMITH, SUSAN WILLIAM, filed by CHAD UDEEN, MARY JANE JEFFERY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL; Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/30/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

19 #4

Declaration of Daniel Lapinski

19 #3

Declaration of Benjamin F. Johns

19 #2

Brief

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (WATKINS, CASEY) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. FERICH on behalf of MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN (FERICH, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. JOHNS on behalf of MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. identifying SUBARU CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#3

(#3) Certification of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#2

(#2) Order Initial Conference set for 1/16/2018 02:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/18/2018. (cry, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#3) Certification of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 2/15/2019 on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • (#26) TEXT ORDER -- The Court having held a conference call with the parties on February 15, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED all discovery is STAYED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED the new deadline to serve letter briefs regarding whether discovery should be stayed is March 8, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/15/19. (Schneider, Joel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#25) TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED a conference call is scheduled on February 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. to address defense counsel's February 13, 2019 letter. Defense counsel shall arrange the call. It is further ORDERED that no documents responsive to plaintiffs' subpoena shall be obtained by plaintiffs before the Court rules on defendant's application. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/13/19. (Schneider, Joel) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT -- FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against LYDIA RUNKEL, MICHAEL BOLICK, GARY GILPIN, ALICIA SMITH, SUSAN WILLIAM, filed by CHAD UDEEN, MARY JANE JEFFERY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL; Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/30/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Letter from Benjamin F Johns re #21 Order. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) LETTER ORDER addressed to Plaintiff's counsel re #19 Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/24/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX M. KASHURBA on behalf of MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN (KASHURBA, ALEX) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Court Appointed Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Benjamin F. Johns.. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Court Appointed Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Benjamin F. Johns. by MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration of Benjamin F. Johns, #4 Declaration of Daniel Lapinski)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/20/2018. (rss, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (WATKINS, CASEY) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. FERICH on behalf of MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN (FERICH, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. JOHNS on behalf of MARY JANE JEFFERY, CHAD UDEEN (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. identifying SUBARU CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Initial Conference set for 1/16/2018 02:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/18/2018. (cry, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INC. SUBARU OF AMERICA from NJ SUPERIOR COURT- CAMDEN CO., LAW DIVISION, case number CAM-L-4425-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9251809), filed by INC. SUBARU OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WALTERS, NEAL) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEAL D. WALTERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASEY GENE WATKINS