This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

Turner v. Social Security Administration et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Turner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael F. Urbanski and Joel C. Hoppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael F. Urbanski

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John P. Turner

Churchville, VA 24421

Defendants

Veterans Administration

Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/28/2019. (jv)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of doc# 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties due to attaching incorrect pdf; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at doc#6 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties; Mailed to Mr. Turner at address provided on docket sheet. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Veterans Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/28/2019. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Veterans Administration, filed by John P. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. 2018 Staunton Veterans Parade, #3 Envelope)(jv) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John P. Turner. (jv) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less