This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 07:57:21 (UTC).

Turner et al v. Office Depot, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Turner filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Office Depot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00779

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keiandra L. Turner

Valenzia Turner

Defendant

Office Depot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor Christopher Bartlett

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis

2224 First Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Angel Alece Darmer

Attorney at Carr Allison

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, Al, AL 35216

Glenn Edwin Ireland

Attorney at Carr, Allison, Pugh, Howard, Oliver & Sisson

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham,, AL 35216

Zachary Paul Mardis

Attorney at Carr Allison

100 Vestavia Pkwy

Birmingham, AL 35216

Virginia Flowers Gambacurta

Attorney at Carr Allison Howard Oliver & Sisson

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/2/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

13 #1

Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry [11]

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Correction re #11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach the correct PDF document to reflect as filed by both plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #11 )(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (Bartlett, Taylor) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#11

(#11) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bartlett, Taylor) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/24/2018 to attach the correct PDF document to reflect as filed by both plaintiffs) (wcl, ). Modified on 10/24/2018 to add the link to the #10 notice (wcl, ). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

10 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#10

(#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Gambacurta, Virginia) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (Bartlett, Taylor) Modified on 9/26/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Flowers Gambacurta on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Gambacurta, Virginia) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Amended and Corrected Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Inc.. (Ireland, Glenn) Modified on 9/17/2018 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF REMOVAL by Office Depot, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #4

Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Office Depot, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-cv-18-901427.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050567) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/2/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Correction re #11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach the correct PDF document to reflect as filed by both plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #11 )(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (Bartlett, Taylor) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bartlett, Taylor) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/24/2018 to attach the correct PDF document to reflect as filed by both plaintiffs) (wcl, ). Modified on 10/24/2018 to add the link to the #10 notice (wcl, ). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Gambacurta, Virginia) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER re #7 MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery. Defendants are directed to respond to the motion on or before 10/9/2018. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/28/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum in Support by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (Bartlett, Taylor) Modified on 9/26/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Flowers Gambacurta on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Gambacurta, Virginia) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended and Corrected Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Inc.. (Ireland, Glenn) Modified on 9/17/2018 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF REMOVAL by Office Depot, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc., filed by Keiandra L. Turner, Valenzia Turner. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Office Depot, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-cv-18-901427.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050567) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less