This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2018 at 07:31:41 (UTC).

Tunley v. Walmart Associates, INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 Tunley filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart Associates, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A Robinson and K. Gary Sebelius. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02499

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A Robinson

Referral Judge

K. Gary Sebelius

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifton A Tunley

Defendants

Walmart Associates, Inc.

Walmart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Gray, II

Attorney at G. Gray Law LLC

2300 Main Street, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsay P Windham

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 W. 75Th, Ste. 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Steven Daniel Hennelly

Attorney at Halbrook Wood PC

3500 W. 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Karen J. Halbrook

Attorney at Halbrook Wood PC

3500 W. 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Lindsay Poehling Windham

Attorney at Halbrook Wood PC

3500 W. 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

 

Court Documents

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:17-cv-00327. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Transfer of Venue. Signed on 8/28/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Defendants Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc..(Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION for order for Transfer of Venue filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/24/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Firm Name Change by Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

#13

(#13) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/1/2017. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/15/2017. Signed on 8/1/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc..(Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

#10

(#10) MOTION to change venue or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file answer on or before July 28, 2017. Signed on 6/27/2017 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifton A Tunley. Walmart Stores, Inc. served on 6/7/2017, answer due 6/28/2017. (Gray, Gerald) Modified on 6/23/2017: Main Document 3 replaced. Document was originally filed with an upside-down image. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/22/2017)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifton A Tunley. Walmart Associates, Inc. served on 6/7/2017, answer due 6/28/2017. (Gray, Gerald) Modified on 6/23/2017: Main Document 3 replaced. Document was originally filed with an upside-down image. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/22/2017)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit Right to Sue

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT initial against Walmart Associates, Inc. and Walmart Stores, Inc. filed by Clifton A. Tunley. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5271238. Service due by 7/28/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(Gray, Gerald) Modified on 5/1/2017 to reflect correct defendants. (Jones, Robin). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 04/29/2017)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:17-cv-00327. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Transfer of Venue. Signed on 8/28/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Defendants Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc..(Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint MOTION for order for Transfer of Venue filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/24/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Firm Name Change by Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/1/2017. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/15/2017. Signed on 8/1/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc..(Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to change venue or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Defendants Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kansas For Profit Corporation Annual Report (Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.), #2 Exhibit B - Kansas For Profit Corporation Annual Report (Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.), #3 Exhibit C - Kansas Corporation Change of Registered Office or Agent (Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.), #4 Kansas Corporation Change of Registered Office or Agent (Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.))(Related document(s) #10 ) (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to change venue or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of appearance by Steven Daniel Hennelly on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Attorney Steven Daniel Hennelly added to party Walmart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Daniel Hennelly added to party Walmart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hennelly, Steven) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of appearance by Lindsay P Windham on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Attorney Lindsay P Windham added to party Walmart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay P Windham added to party Walmart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Windham, Lindsay) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of appearance by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. (Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file answer on or before July 28, 2017. Signed on 6/27/2017 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/10/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Karen J. Halbrook added to party Walmart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Karen J. Halbrook added to party Walmart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Halbrook, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifton A Tunley. Walmart Stores, Inc. served on 6/7/2017, answer due 6/28/2017. (Gray, Gerald) Modified on 6/23/2017: Main Document 3 replaced. Document was originally filed with an upside-down image. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifton A Tunley. Walmart Associates, Inc. served on 6/7/2017, answer due 6/28/2017. (Gray, Gerald) Modified on 6/23/2017: Main Document 3 replaced. Document was originally filed with an upside-down image. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Associates, Inc.. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 05/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT initial against Walmart Associates, Inc. and Walmart Stores, Inc. filed by Clifton A. Tunley. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5271238. Service due by 7/28/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(Gray, Gerald) Modified on 5/1/2017 to reflect correct defendants. (Jones, Robin). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/29/2017.] (Entered: 04/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less