This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:23:51 (UTC).

Tullos v. Biomet, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Tullos filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kristine G. Baker

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doyle E Tullos

Defendants

Biomet Orthopedics LLC

Biomet Manufacturing Corporation

Biomet US Reconstruction LLC

Biomet Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul J. James

Attorney at James Carter & Priebe, LLP

Post Office Box 907

Little Rock, AR 72203

Defendant Attorneys

Adrienne Franco Busby

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

J. Joseph Tanner

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John D. LaDue

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 East Wayne Street, Suite 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Erin Linder Hanig

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 East Wayne Street, Suite 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Stephanie N. Russo

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrew L. Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3007223.), filed by Doyle Tullos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(James PHV, Paul) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2016)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corporation, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corporation, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

#4

RESTRICTED

#76

(#76) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/22/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/13/19. (lp) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#74

(#74) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/29/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#73

(#73) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of All Defendants (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

72 #1

*Restricted*

#72

(#72) Case electronically transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:16-cv-00508. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#71

(#71) GROUP 2 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS transferring case to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Western Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/18. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/16/2018)

#69

(#69) ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#68

(#68) ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#63

(#63) ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/24/2018)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/22/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/13/19. (lp) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #74 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/29/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of All Defendants (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) Case electronically transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:16-cv-00508. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) GROUP 2 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS transferring case to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Western Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/18. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#70) STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • (#9) TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, J. Presnal, N. Ward, A. Davis, and K. Barton for A. Diab. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, and E. Hanig. The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/29/16 STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for August 29, 2016 hearing at 11:00 a.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/25/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(lns) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The court VACATES the referral to Magistrate Judge Nuechterlein, and REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Michael Gotsch to determine any pretrial matters and to conduct such proceedings as are required, and, when appropriate, to enter into the record proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Local Rule 72-1. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • (#6) TELEPHONIC HEARING on PSC's request to extend custodial depositions deadline was held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, N. Ward, J. Presnall. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated in open court the request to extend the deadline is DENIED. If previously undisclosed documents are produced in the Florida case that would justify reopening a deposition, the court will entertain a motion to reopen and to assess costs. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/10/16 DISCOVERY HEARING Call-in information for August 10, 2016 hearing at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/4/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Biomet Manufacturing Corporation, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corporation, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corporation, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3007223.), filed by Doyle Tullos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(James PHV, Paul) [Transferred from innd on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.