This case was last updated from PACER on 01/30/2018 at 05:57:54 (UTC).

Tubbs v. Saad

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 Tubbs filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Saad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey and James E. Seibert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judge

James E. Seibert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Van Tubbs

Glenville, WV 26351

Respondent

J. Saad

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER ADOPTING #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Tubbs. This action is transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/26/18. (copy to petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Tubbs that this action be transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/4/18. (copy mailed to Petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #5 Order to Serve Order and 2241 Petition, filed by J. Saad. (Overstreet, Adam) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

13 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2241 petition and order on Respondent, U. S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney. Respondent to answer within 60 days of service on U.S. Attorney as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/04/2017. (Copy mailed to Petitioner) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#10

(#10) Order for Petitioner to file his reply to #9 Response filed by J. Saad, no later than 12/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/08/2017. (Copy mailed to Petitioner.) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)

14 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) Order for petitioner to file correct form 2241 by 9/8/17. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 9/8/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/18/2017. (order and form mailed to petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)

#6

(#6) Petition (Doc. 4) & Order (Doc. 5) served on Warden Jennifer Saad, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#4

(#4) 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Van Tubbs; ref to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 09/12/2017)

#2

(#2) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 46031044167; ref to Judge Murray (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2017)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed J. Saad served on 10/12/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Van Tubbs; ref to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2017)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#13

(#13) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00370. (njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Seibert, and LC Blalock (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Warden Jennifer Saad executed 10/10/17 (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00370. (njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Seibert, and LC Blalock (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER ADOPTING #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Tubbs. This action is transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/26/18. (copy to petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Tubbs to Judge DuBose. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Tubbs that this action be transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/4/18. (copy mailed to Petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order for Petitioner to file his reply to #9 Response filed by J. Saad, no later than 12/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/08/2017. (Copy mailed to Petitioner.) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #9 Response to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #5 Order to Serve Order and 2241 Petition, filed by J. Saad. (Overstreet, Adam) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed J. Saad served on 10/12/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed as to Warden Jennifer Saad executed 10/10/17 (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Petition (Doc. 4) & Order (Doc. 5) served on Warden Jennifer Saad, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2241 petition and order on Respondent, U. S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney. Respondent to answer within 60 days of service on U.S. Attorney as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/04/2017. (Copy mailed to Petitioner) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Van Tubbs; ref to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 09/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order for petitioner to file correct form 2241 by 9/8/17. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 9/8/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/18/2017. (order and form mailed to petitioner) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 46031044167; ref to Judge Murray (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Van Tubbs; ref to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 1/29/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.