This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 09:58:11 (UTC).

TTI, Inc. et al v. Elna America Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 TTI, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Elna America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and William Alsup. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02389

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mouser Electronics, Inc.

Defendants

Nichicon Corporation

Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd.

Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.

Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd.

Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd.

Elna America Inc.

Holy Stone Polytech Co., Ltd.

Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd.

Panasonic Corporation of North America

TDK U.S.A. Corporation

Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd.

Rubycon Corporation

Taitsu America, Inc.

Nichicon (America) Corporation

Milestone Global Technology, Inc. (d/b/a Holystone International)

Nissei Electric Co. Ltd.

EPCOS Inc.

Panasonic Corporation

Rubycon America Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonas Noah Hagey

Attorney at BraunHagey & Borden LLP

220 Sansome Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew Brooks Borden

Attorney at BraunHagey & Borden LLP

220 Sansome Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ryan Mitchell Roper

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jason Chad Arnette

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Joakim Gustaf Soederbaum

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Bryan Davis

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorney

Ian L Papendick

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

17 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2018) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION Re: Defendants' Waiver of Service of Process and Deadline to Respond to the Direct Action Complaint Filed by TTI, Inc. and Mouser Electronics, Inc., filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • (#18) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the Court's web page at: www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • (#16) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc... (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Roper. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joakim G. Soederbaum. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Chad Arnette. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan Davis. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12314083) filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Roper, Ryan) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12314026) filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Soederbaum, Joakim) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12313949) filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Arnette, Jason) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12313893) filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Bryan) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/4/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12290180). Filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc. & TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milestone Global Technology, Inc. (d/b/a Holystone International) is a litigant