This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2018 at 07:59:02 (UTC).

TSI Products Inc v. Armor All/STP Products Company

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 TSI Products Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Armor All/STP Products Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stefan R Underhill and Michael P. Shea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01682

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stefan R Underhill

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSI Products, Inc.

Defendants

Robert DeRidder

Spectrum Brands Holding Company, Inc.

Armor All/STP Products Company

Guy Andrysck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven M. Coyle

Attorney at Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd

20 Church Street, 22Nd Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Nicholas Andrew Geiger

Attorney at Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd

20 Church Street, 22Nd Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Tasia E. Perkins

Attorney at Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd

20 Church Street, 22Nd Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#80

#77

76 #1

Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Emily Y

#76

75 #1

Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Isabell

#75

74 #1

Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David E

#74

#73

8 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • Cases associated. Create association to 3:17-cv-01131-MPS. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #74 MOTION for Attorney(s) David E. Dunham to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016165) by TSI Products, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2018. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2018. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #76 MOTION for Attorney(s) Emily Young to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016185) by TSI Products, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) MOTION for Attorney(s) Emily Young to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016185) by TSI Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Emily Young)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) MOTION for Attorney(s) Isabelle M. Antongiorgi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016177) by TSI Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Isabelle M. Antongiorgi)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) MOTION for Attorney(s) David E. Dunham to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5016165) by TSI Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David E. Dunham)(Coyle, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 10/18/2018. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE of Appearance by Tasia E. Perkins on behalf of TSI Products, Inc. (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the deadline for The Armor All/STP Products Company to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is 12/4/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/9/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by TSI Products Inc. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Dunham, David) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by The Armor All/STP Products Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Alan Dabdoub added to party The Armor All/STP Products Company(pty:dft) (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Advisory to the Court Regarding Service of Process and Extension of Deadline for Defendant to File Its Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by TSI Products Inc (Dunham, David) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to The Armor All/STP Products Company. (ams) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by TSI Products Inc. (Dunham, David) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sss) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TSI Products, Inc.. (Dunham, David) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Armor All/STP Products Company filed by TSI Products, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8578403) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Dunham, David) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spectrum Brands Holding Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tasia E. Perkins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas A. Geiger