This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:54:23 (UTC).

Truong v. Von Blanckensee

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Truong filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Von Blanckensee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra C. Freeman and Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-09039

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C. Freeman

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Peter Truong

Otisville, NY 10963

Respondents

Barbara Von Blackensee

Warden Barbara Von Blanckensee

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) HABEAS INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Peter Truong 62383-112 FCI Otisville P.O. Box 1000 Otisville, NY 10963, at, on 11/7/2018 Re: #6 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2241. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241: The Court, having examined the petition in this action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Civil Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. Within sixty days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleadings in response to the petition. Petitioner may file reply papers, if any, within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. SO ORDERED. Barbara Von Blanckensee answer due on 1/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/07/2018) (ama) Modified on 11/8/2018 (ama). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/5/2018) (mro) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/2/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Peter Truong.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Peter Truong.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) HABEAS INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Peter Truong 62383-112 FCI Otisville P.O. Box 1000 Otisville, NY 10963, at, on 11/7/2018 Re: #6 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2241. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241: The Court, having examined the petition in this action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Civil Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. Within sixty days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleadings in response to the petition. Petitioner may file reply papers, if any, within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. SO ORDERED. Barbara Von Blanckensee answer due on 1/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/07/2018) (ama) Modified on 11/8/2018 (ama). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/5/2018) (mro) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Peter Truong 62383-112 FCI Otisville P.O. Box 1000 Otisville, NY 10963. (vba) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/2/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Peter Truong.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Peter Truong.(rdz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.