This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 16:48:49 (UTC).

TROVY et al v. BAYER U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 TROVY filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against BAYER U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01438

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORMA RHYMES

AMANDA LAWSON

MARLENE RUIZ

JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO

STEPHANIE HUFF

ASHELLA MOODY

WENDY MARTINEZ

CHRISTINA PEPCORN

CHRISTI HILLS

TRACY JENKINS

MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ

LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS

EMILY MCLAUGHLIN

MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA

CAREENA HUNTER

CRISTINA MOLINA

JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ

Defendants

BAYER AG

BAYER U.S. LLC

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory J. Bubalo

Attorney at Bubalo Law PLC

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 210

Louisville, KY 40222

Jason M. Lichtenstein

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

600 Grant Street, U.S. Steel Tower, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1925

Katherine A. Dunnington

Attorney at Bubalo Law PLC

9300 Shelbyville Road, Suite 210

Louisville, KY 40222

Jennifer L. Thompson

Attorney at Gary C. Johnson, P.S.C.

9300 Shelbyville Rd Ste 609

Louisville, KY 40222

Defendant Attorneys

Gary D. McConnell

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Katherine L. Pomerleau

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, Usx Tower 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Pomerleau on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. McConnell on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#24

(#24) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/03/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

23 #3

Proposed Order

23 #2

Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

23 #1

Affidavit of Jennifer L. Thompson

#23

(#23) MOTION for attorney Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4951737) by ALEYA AHMED, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, SHARON BRACE, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, KIMBERLY GRACE, CONSTANCE GRECO, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, TRACY JENKINS, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, AMETRIS WILSON, MICHELLE WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Thompson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/4/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

22 #3

Exhibit B

#22

(#22) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,, filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

4 #1

Proposed Order Granting Remand

#4

(#22) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,, filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#6) Errata re #3 Notice of Appearance,,,,, by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filing name. (Dunnington, Katherine) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bubalo on behalf of ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney McConnell advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Pomerleau on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. McConnell on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/03/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for attorney Jennifer L. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4951737) by ALEYA AHMED, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, SHARON BRACE, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, KIMBERLY GRACE, CONSTANCE GRECO, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, TRACY JENKINS, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, AMETRIS WILSON, MICHELLE WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Thompson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/4/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,, filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER ESSURE INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAYER U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Healthcare Pharma Service) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER ESSURE INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Essure Inc. Service) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, JOSEFINA PIMENTEL ALANIZ, EMILY MCLAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, MARIA JIMENEZ, TRACY JENKINS, LINA FLORES, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, SHARON BRACE, LAORA BEARD, AMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, CONSTANCE GRECO, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, ALEYA AHMED, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, MARTA LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, KIMBERLY GRACE, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. BAYER CORPORATION served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt for Bayer Corporation Service) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay. This matter will be administratively closed pending the ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/05/18. (eca) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER U.S. LLC. (McConnell, Gary) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer AG, #2 Summons Bayer Essure Inc, #3 Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC, #4 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, #5 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, #6 Summons Bayer S.A., #7 Summons Conceptus SAS) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA re #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KATEY HEADLEY, ERICA COSTA, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, NARMI JUAREZ, NORMA RHYMES, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, LISSA VINCELETT, EMILY LAUGHLIN, VALERIE ROSS, OKENNY GONZALEZ, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, KAYLA MCCURDY, NINA JONES, WENDY MARTINEZ, TABATHA REEVES, NELSY SIRI, CRISTINA MOLINA, STEPHANIE HUFF, LORA HALL, VERONICA LEDEZMA, CHRISTI HILLS, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, DEANNA BRUCE, SARA LYON, BESCERLEE VEGA, JOANNIE SANDERS, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, LINA FLORES, MARIA JIMENEZ, JENNIFER KING, DORA GOMEZ, YOLANDA ZAVALZA, LAORA BEARD, TAMETRIS WILSON, JOLENE CLINE, ROCHELLE DIAZ, CAROLINA LUNA, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, FECELITA KINGCADE, NANCY CAULEY, HEATHER LOCHNER, ROBIN DOUGLAS, NICOLE TROVY, SAMANTHA KACK, AMANDA LAWSON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, ALEYA AHMED, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, LYNDA ARRENDALE, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, ANA KIPER, STACEY MOSELEY, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, MARLENE RUIZ, SANDRA GARCIA, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, COURTNEY LEWIS, WENDY ESPARZA, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, RIA FONTANILLA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, SIERRA SCOTT, ASHLEE CURLE, TARA PENNINGTON, DONNIELLE WEBER, CAREENA HUNTER, MICHELLE WILSON, ALMA MAYORGA, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bayer HQ location - Pittsburgh) (Bubalo, Gregory) Modified on 10/30/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Errata re #3 Notice of Appearance,,,,, by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filing name. (Dunnington, Katherine) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,, filed by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Huffington Post - This Birth Control Device Kept Making Women Sick 4-1-2018) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bubalo on behalf of ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bubalo on behalf of ALEYA AHMED, MARIBEL ALVEREZ, LYNDA ARRENDALE, VIRGINIA ASPILCUETA, MISTY BAUMGARDNER, LAORA BEARD, LATERRICA BILLINGSLEY, LORENA GARCIA BORJA, DEANNA BRUCE, MARIA DEL REFUGIO IBA CARO, NANCY CAULEY, JOLENE CLINE, ERICA COSTA, ASHLEE CURLE, LAKEISHA DAQUIGAN, JENNY CENTENO DE AGUILERA, LIBIA DURAN DE CONTRERAS, ROCHELLE DIAZ, ROBIN DOUGLAS, WENDY ESPARZA, LINA FLORES, RIA FONTANILLA, SANDRA GARCIA, DORA GOMEZ, OKENNY GONZALEZ, LORA HALL, KATEY HEADLEY, CHRISTI HILLS, STEPHANIE HUFF, CAREENA HUNTER, MARIA JIMENEZ, FRANCESCA JOHNSON, NINA JONES, NARMI JUAREZ, SAMANTHA KACK, CATHERINE KERRIGAN, JENNIFER KING, FECELITA KINGCADE, ANA KIPER, EMILY LAUGHLIN, AMANDA LAWSON, VERONICA LEDEZMA, COURTNEY LEWIS, HEATHER LOCHNER, JOANNA LOPEZ-MORENO, CAROLINA LUNA, SARA LYON, WENDY MARTINEZ, ALMA MAYORGA, KAYLA MCCURDY, CINTHIA RODRIGUEZ MESINA, CRISTINA MOLINA, ASHELLA MOODY, ALECIA MOORE, VIRIDIANA GARCIA MORENO, STACEY MOSELEY, MARIA ELIZARRARAS ORTIZ, MARTHA GONZALEZ PAEZ, TARA PENNINGTON, CHRISTINA PEPCORN, MARIA GUADALUPE ZAMOR RAMIREZ, TABATHA REEVES, NORMA RHYMES, VALERIE ROSS, MARLENE RUIZ, JOANNIE SANDERS, SIERRA SCOTT, NELSY SIRI, MARIA PEREZ SOTOMAYOR, NAKEITHA TAYLOR, NICOLE TROVY, BESCERLEE VEGA, LISSA VINCELETT, DONNIELLE WEBER, SHANTEL WILLIAMS, MICHELLE WILSON, TAMETRIS WILSON, YOLANDA ZAVALZA. (Bubalo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney McConnell advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 18-012845 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4910829), filed by BAYER U.S. LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (ksa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less