This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:53:58 (UTC).

Trevino v. Coakley

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Trevino filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Coakley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aaron Trevino

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Joe Coakley

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/8/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

9 #1

cover letter

#9

(#9) OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations, styled as "Notice to Agent is Notice to Principal, Notice to Principal is Notice to Agent." (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aaron Trevino. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

7 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to 4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Aaron Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

1 #2

Attachment A-1B, Facts

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Joe Coakley, filed by Aaron Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-1, History; #2 Attachment A-1B, Facts; #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/8/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations, styled as "Notice to Agent is Notice to Principal, Notice to Principal is Notice to Agent." (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aaron Trevino. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Aaron Trevino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/16/2018. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to 4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#4) PAPERLESS NOTICE: Filing fee of $5.00 paid in case 2:18cv89 to be applied to 3:18cv142 pursuant to Paperless Order entered on 9/11/2018 in 2:18cv89. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) Modified on 9/11/2018 - certified mail receipt no. 7017 2680 0000 2233 4155 (tlg). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Aaron Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Joe Coakley, filed by Aaron Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-1, History; #2 Attachment A-1B, Facts; #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less