This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:12:35 (UTC).

Treanor v. Micron Technology Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Treanor filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Micron Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-03805

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Treanor

Defendants

Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.

Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.

Micron Semiconductor Products Inc.

SK Hynix America, Inc

SK Hynix Inc.

Micron Technology Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co Ltd

Hynix Semiconductor America Inc.

Hynix Semiconductor Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Alexander Saveri

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Geoffrey Conrad Rushing

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark Francis Ram

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlngame, CA 94010

Elizabeth R. Odette

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Sarah Jane Van Culin

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael A. Montano

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

W. Joseph Bruckner

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Brian D Clark

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Elizabeth Tran Castillo

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre and McCarthy

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Brian Michael Hogan

Attorney at Freed Kanner London Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Rd., Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Douglas A. Millen

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

William Henry London

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

William H. London

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Defendant Attorneys

Harrison J. Frahn, IV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Stephen Joel McIntyre

Attorney at OMelveny and Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Brian Patrick Quinn

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Ian T Simmons

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-4001

Brian Yanlang Chang

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SK Telecom Co., Ltd. for SK Hynix Inc. (Chang, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Yanlang Chang (Chang, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William H. London. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Hogan. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Hogan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12615824.) filed by John Treanor. (Hogan, Brian) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12615794.) filed by John Treanor. (Millen, Douglas) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William H. London ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12615752.) filed by John Treanor. (London, William) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Trott (Trott, Adam) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER REGARDING OMNIBUS STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/18. Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. Status Conference set for 9/14/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Treanor. Micron Semiconductor Products Inc. served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 7/18/2018) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Treanor. Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 7/18/2018) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case Reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras, Set/Reset Hearing re #6 Order Relating Case. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/5/18. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (JSW) immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will be rescheduled by the Court. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc., SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc., SK Hynix America, Inc, SK Hynix Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12465787.). Filed by John Treanor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/26/2018) Modified on 6/29/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON CONSUMER PRODUCTS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant