This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2018 at 05:59:20 (UTC).

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Liebert Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Liebert Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendants

Liebert Corporation

Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L Harding

Attorney at Sasscer Clagett and Bucher

5407 Water St Ste 101

Upper Marlboro, MD 20772

Kevin P Smith

Attorney at Law Office of Robert A Stutman PC

501 Office Center Dr Ste 300

Fort Washington, PA 19034

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Francis Maloney

Attorney at Joseph Greenwald and Laake PA

6404 Ivy Ln Ste 400

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Justin Edward Tepe

Attorney at Franklin & Prokopik, PC

2 N. Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Stephen J Marshall

Attorney at Franklin and Prokopik PC

Two N Charles St Ste 600

Baltimore, MD 21201

Adam K Peck

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin and White LLC

400 20Th St. North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher C Yearout

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin and White LLC

400 20Th St. North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Melody Eagan

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin and White LLC

400 20Th St. North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

37 #1

*Restricted*

#37

#36

#35

#34

33 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

33 #1

Memorandum in Support

#33

32 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

5 #1

Affidavit of Counsel

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Case Information Report

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura added. Motions referred to Chelsey M. Vascura. (pb) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:18-cv-00338. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER Granting #33 Motion to Transfer Case; Directing Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/18/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Ohio filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Smith, Kevin) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER Setting deadlines for response/reply re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Ohio filed by Liebert Corporation. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/28/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Ohio by Liebert Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Maloney, Timothy) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Liebert Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Maloney, Timothy) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STATUS REPORT (Initial Joint Status Report) by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.(Yearout, Christopher) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin P Smith. Attorney Kevin P Smith will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Yearout. Directing attorney Christopher Yearout to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Emerson Electric Co., Other Affiliate Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Emerson Electric Co. EECO, Inc. for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joinder in and Consent to Removal. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2018: #1 Affidavit of Counsel) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. served on 1/5/2018.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Liebert Corporation, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL17-40171. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637103698), filed by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liebert Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin P. Smith